California Central District Court
Judge:Jesus G Bernal
Referred: Shashi H Kewalramani
Case #: 5:23-cv-00417
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2023
Terminated:Jun 20, 2023
Case in other court:Riverside County Superior Court, CVRI2300608
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 2:15 AM PDT
Defendant
Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By
Alexandra Coronado King
Houser LLP
contact info
Robert W Norman, Jr
Houser LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust
Represented By
Alexandra Coronado King
Houser LLP
contact info
Robert W Norman, Jr
Houser LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Elizabeth May
Represented By
Fernando Leone
Fernando Leone Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff
James May
Represented By
Fernando Leone
Fernando Leone Law Offices
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, June 19, 2023
20 20 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Mon 06/19 10:06 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth May, James May. Dismissal is without Prejudice. (Leone, Fernando)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
19 19 misc For Judicial Notice Fri 05/26 10:11 AM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 18 filed by Defendants First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC.(Norman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "1",
Att: 2 Exhibit "2",
Att: 3 Exhibit "3",
Att: 4 Exhibit "4",
Att: 5 Exhibit "5"
18 18 motion Dismiss Case Fri 05/26 10:06 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/17/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Norman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, May 12, 2023
17 17 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 05/12 9:05 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: First Amended Complaint16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
16 16 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Thu 05/11 1:06 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiffs James May, Elizabeth May(Leone, Fernando)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - D
Thursday, April 27, 2023
15 15 order Dismiss Case Thu 04/27 3:02 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Order (1) GRANTING Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. 7); and (2) VACATING the May 1, 2023 Hearing7 . Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint, if any, by May 10, 2023. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
14 14 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 04/21 10:37 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal re: MOTION to Dismiss Case 7 . THE HEARING ON THE MOTION IS CONTINUED FROM 4/24/2023 TO 5/1/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
13 13 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 04/10 12:26 PM
REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 7 filed by Defendants First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Norman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
12 12 15 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/03 8:24 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 7 filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth May, James May. (Leone, Fernando)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
11 11 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 03/24 4:02 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only10 served on 03/24/23. (Norman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 03/21 5:02 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
9 9 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 03/20 10:37 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
8 8 misc For Judicial Notice Fri 03/17 2:09 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 7 filed by Defendants First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC.(Norman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "1",
Att: 2 Exhibit "2",
Att: 3 Exhibit "3",
Att: 4 Exhibit "4",
Att: 5 Exhibit "5"
7 7 motion Dismiss Case Fri 03/17 2:02 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/24/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Norman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 03/13 9:22 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 03/13 9:21 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 03/13 9:21 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 03/10 9:58 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants FIRST FRANKLIN MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST, MORTGAGE LOAN ASSETBACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-FFC, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., AS TRUSTEE, SUC, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, (Norman, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 03/10 9:54 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants FIRST FRANKLIN MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST, MORTGAGE LOAN ASSETBACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-FFC, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., AS TRUSTEE, SUC, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Norman, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/10 9:51 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number CVRI2300608 Receipt No: ACACDC-34932534 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants FIRST FRANKLIN MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST, MORTGAGE LOAN ASSETBACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-FFC, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., AS TRUSTEE, SUC, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attorney Robert W Norman, Jr added to party FIRST FRANKLIN MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST, MORTGAGE LOAN ASSETBACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-FFC, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., AS TRUSTEE, SUC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert W Norman, Jr added to party Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:dft))(Norman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "1" - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit "2" - Docket
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 03/13 9:29 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10, inclusive, First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC., filed by plaintiffs James May, Elizabeth May. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/7/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1 OF PAGE 1 OF 44) (ghap)
Related: [-]