Barak Federman v. Cerebral, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando M Olguin |
Referred: | Maria A Audero |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01803 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 2:27 AM PDT |
Consol Plaintiff
Attiya Awadallah
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Jane Doe
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
John Doe
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
David Gould
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Lyndell Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Dawn Pittinger
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Rita Sanders
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Cherri Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cerebral, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barak Federman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
70 | 70
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 05/03 2:45 PM
ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Carey Busen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Cerebral, Inc., designating Teresa Chow as local counsel69 . (iv) |
|
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
69 | 69
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Thu 05/02 4:34 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Carey S. Busen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Cerebral, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37400594) filed by Defendant Cerebral, Inc.. (Chow, Teresa) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |