West Virginia Northern District Court
Judge:John Preston Bailey
Case #: 5:23-cv-00091
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2023
Terminated:May 10, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 5:48 AM EDT
Defendant
Freda Pennington
Defendant
Robert Pennington
Plaintiff
Marion County Coal Resources, Inc.
Represented By
J. R. Hall
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote
contact info
Rodger L. Puz
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/10/2023 2:42 PM EST
Friday, March 10, 2023
1 1 14 pgs COMPLAINT against Freda Pennington, Robert Pennington, filed by Marion County Coal Resources, Inc.. Filing Fee $402. Receipt #AWVNDC-3666091.(ag)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Hearing by Marion County Coal Resources, Inc..(Hall, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Scheduling,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
3 3 13 pgs Memorandum in Support re2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Hearing filed by Marion County Coal Resources, Inc.. (Hall, J.)
Related: [-]