Washington Western District Court
Judge:Barbara J Rothstein
Case #: 2:23-cv-00352
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2023
Terminated:Sep 09, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 2:24 AM PDT
Defendant
Robert Brown
Represented By
Dallas LePierre
Seattle City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Catherine E Riedo
Seattle City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
City of Seattle
Represented By
Dallas LePierre
Seattle City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Catherine E Riedo
Seattle City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Sean Culbertson
Represented By
Dallas LePierre
Seattle City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Catherine E Riedo
Seattle City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Daniel Nelson
Represented By
Dallas LePierre
Seattle City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Catherine E Riedo
Seattle City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Meinecke
Represented By
Keith Allen Kemper
Ellis Li & Mckinstry
contact info
Nathan W Kellum
Center For Religious Expression
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, September 09, 2024
52 52 order Judgment - Consent Mon 09/09 2:00 PM
CONSENT ORDER AND JUDGMENT. It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED as follows: (1) Defendants, their police officers, and agents are hereby enjoined from applying or enforcing § 12A.16.010(A)(3) against Plaintiff Matthew Meinecke in public parks, streets, or other traditional public fora based on real or anticipated hostile reaction of an audience. (2) The parties will comply with the monetary terms of the agreement reached and memorialized in 8/22/2024 settlement agreement. (3) This Court retains jurisdiction of this case solely to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and this consent order and judgment. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (KRA)
Related: [-]
51 51 misc Proposed Order (Unsigned) Mon 09/09 9:06 AM
PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) AND JUDGMENT (Kellum, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
50 50 minutes Settlement Conference Fri 09/06 10:39 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold- Dep Clerk: Kelly Miller ; Pla Counsel: Nathan Kellum ; Def Counsel: Dallas LaPierre ; Time of Hearing: 9:30 AM ; Telephone Conference Re: Settlement held on 9/6/2024. (KAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
49 49 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 09/04 10:01 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference Re: Resolution Dispute set for 9/6/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold, at parties' request. Counsel, please be advised that Courtroom Deputy, Kelly Miller, will initiate this call. (KAM)
Related: [-]