National Association of Television Program Executives, Inc. v. Navigators Insurance Company et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | R Gary Klausner |
Referred: | Alka Sagar |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01805 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 11, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Los Angeles Superior Court, 22STCV32347 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 2:47 AM PDT |
Defendant
Navigators Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
National Association of Television Program Executives, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, July 28, 2023 | ||
43 | 43
judgmentCV
Judgment
Fri 07/28 12:10 PM
JUDGMENT42 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF TELEVISION PROGRAM EXECUTIVES, INC.'S First Amended Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREWDICE. The Court orders that such judgment be entered. (jp) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2023 | ||
42 | 42
stip
Judgment
Wed 07/26 2:20 PM
STIPULATION for Judgment as to as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Navigators Insurance Company.(Yanni, Rebekah) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2023 | ||
41 | 41
order
Dismiss
Wed 07/12 2:15 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint [DE33 by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (See document for further information). (jp) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
40 | 40
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 06/14 1:44 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint33 , calendared for hearing on 6/20/2023, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Appearance
Tue 06/13 10:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert David Dennison on behalf of Defendant Navigators Insurance Company (Attorney Robert David Dennison added to party Navigators Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Dennison, Robert) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2023 | ||
38 | 38
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 06/05 1:31 PM
REPLY Navigators Reply to Plaintiff's Amended Opposition to Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 33 filed by Defendant Navigators Insurance Company. (Yanni, Rebekah) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
37 | 37
25
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Wed 05/31 8:43 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 33 AMENDED OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND filed by Plaintiff National Association of Television Program Executives, Inc.. (Peter, Arnold) |
|
36 | 36
order
Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106) - optional html form
Wed 05/31 2:07 PM
ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion35 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): Memorandum in Opposition is over 20 pages in violation of this Court's Standing Order7 . Counsel has until 6/1/23 to refile a corrected opposition. (jre) |
|
Monday, May 29, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Mon 05/29 12:25 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 33 filed by Plaintiff National Association of Television Program Executives, Inc.. (Peter, Arnold) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 05/19 4:23 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The hearing on Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint33 is CONTINUED to 6/20/2023, at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Briefing shall reset accordingly.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) |
|
33 | 33
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Fri 05/19 4:08 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Navigators Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 6/19/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Yanni, Rebekah) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Rebekah E. Yanni in support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12 (b)(6), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Rebekah E. Yanni Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Rebekah E. Yanni Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to Rebekah E. Yanni Declaration, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 to Rebekah E. Yanni Declaration, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 to Rebekah E. Yanni Declaration, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 to Rebekah E. Yanni Declaration, | ||
Att: 8 Request for Judicial Notice in support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), | ||
Att: 9 Proposed Order Re Defendant Navigators Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), | ||
Att: 10 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, May 15, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)
Mon 05/15 10:41 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than November 24, 2023. (jre) |
|
31 | 31
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Mon 05/15 10:40 AM
ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2024 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Jury Trial set for 1/16/2024 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) |
|
30 | 30
minutes
Scheduling Conference - optional html form
Mon 05/15 10:38 AM
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Amended Pleadings due by 6/15/2023. Discovery cut-off 10/25/2023. Motions due by 11/8/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2024 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Jury Trial set for 1/16/2024 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (jre) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 05/12 11:11 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (DKT.26 ) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: In light of the filing of Plaintiff on May 12, 2023 (Dkt.28 ) the Order to Show Cause is discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc) |
|
28 | 28
misc
Declaration
Fri 05/12 10:28 AM
DECLARATION of Eyal Farahan and Arnold Peter filed by Plaintiff National Association of Television Program Executives, Inc..(Peter, Arnold) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A TO DECLARATION OF EYAL FARAHAN RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Arnold P. Peter re Order to Show Cause | ||
Tuesday, May 09, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 05/09 2:15 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner. On the Court's own motion, the hearings on the Order to Show Cause and Scheduling Conference are ADVANCED to 5/15/2023, at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Plaintiff's written response is now due on or before 5/12/2023 at 12:00 pm (noon). Counsel are ordered to appear on this earlier date. SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
minutes
Status Conference - optional html form
Tue 05/09 2:07 PM
MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Not Held)/STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge R. Gary Klausner: Case called. Counsel for defendant makes her appearance. No appearance is made by or onbehalf of Plaintiff. The Court sets an Order to Show Cause Hearing for May 22, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. to determine why the complaint should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. A written response is due on or before May 15, 2023. The Scheduling Conference is continued to May 22, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos. (jre) Modified on 5/9/2023 (jre) |
|
Sunday, May 07, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Sun 05/07 8:07 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Navigators Insurance Company amending Complaint - (Discovery), JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff National Association of Television Program Executives, Inc.(Peter, Arnold) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to First Amended Complaint | ||
Monday, May 01, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
order
Dismiss
Mon 05/01 3:54 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) [DE14 ] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court GRANTS the Motion to Dismiss. In its untimely Opposition to the Motion, Plaintiff requests leave to amend. In light of the liberal policy in favor of amendment, the Court GRANTS LEAVE to file a First Amended Complaint within seven calendar days of this Order's issuance. (jp) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Mon 05/01 3:05 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff National Association of Television Program Executives, Inc... (Peter, Arnold) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 04/27 10:55 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: 5. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint14 , calendared for hearing on 5/1/2023, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
order
Leave to File Document
Wed 04/26 12:22 PM
ORDER RE: DEFENDANT NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY'S EX PARTE APPLICATION20 by Judge R. Gary Klausner that Defendant Ex Parte Application20 is GRANTED in that Plaintiff's Opposition18 is hereby STRICKEN. (jp) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 04/26 9:01 AM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Reply filed by Defendant Navigators Insurance Company. (Yanni, Rebekah) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Rebekah E. Yanni in support of Ex Parte Application for Leave to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Late Filed Opposition, or alternatively, to Strike Plaintiff's Opposition, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Re Defendant Navigators Insurance Company's Ex Parte Application for Leave to File a Reply, or alternatively, to Strike Plaintiff's Opposition | ||
Tuesday, April 25, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/25 9:21 AM
Notice OF ERRATA RE OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND filed by Plaintiff National Association of Television Program Executives, Inc.. (Peter, Arnold) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Mon 04/24 10:10 PM
OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) 14 filed by Plaintiff National Association of Television Program Executives, Inc..(Peter, Arnold) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration OF EYAL FARAHAN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND | ||
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/20 10:11 AM
DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge R. Gary Klausner re Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint16 . NO GOOD CAUSE SHOWN. (jp) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
stip
Reschedule
Tue 04/18 10:36 PM
STIPULATION to Reschedule Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Plaintiff National Association of Television Program Executives, Inc..(Peter, Arnold) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) | ||
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Fri 03/31 3:57 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/1/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 5/8/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Fri 03/31 2:37 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Navigators Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 5/1/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Yanni, Rebekah) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Rebekah Yanni in Support of Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A-G in Support of Motion | ||
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 11:06 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES11 IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Notice (Other)9 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The document is STRICKEN. (jre) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 03/17 10:40 AM
Notice TO COUNSEL RE CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE filed by Plaintiff National Association of Television Program Executives, Inc.. (Peter, Arnold) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 10:09 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice (Other)9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Document submitted in the wrong case. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Association of Counsel.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Fri 03/17 7:43 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT,8 by Judge R. Gary Klausner: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendant Navigators Insurance Company shall respond to the Complaint by and/or on March 31, 2023. (es) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/16 4:49 PM
(DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER13 .) - Notice TO COUNSEL RE CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE filed by Plaintiff National Association of Television Program Executives, Inc.. (Peter, Arnold) Modified on 3/17/2023 (jre) |
|
8 | 8
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Thu 03/16 2:23 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Navigators Insurance Company answer now due 3/31/2023, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Navigators Insurance Company.(Yanni, Rebekah) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint | ||
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 03/13 5:09 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/13 12:59 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/13 12:59 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/13 12:58 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/10 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Navigators Insurance Company, a New York corporation, identifying Plaintiff National Association of Television Program Executives, Inc.; Defendant Navigators Insurance Company, which is wholly owned by The Navigators Group, Inc.; TNGI, which is wholly owned by The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.; and HFSG, which is publicly traded corporation that has no parent corporation.. (Yanni, Rebekah) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/10 11:33 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Navigators Insurance Company, a New York corporation. (Yanni, Rebekah) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/10 11:31 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22STCV32347 Receipt No: ACACDC-34933959 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Navigators Insurance Company, a New York corporation. (Attorney Rebekah Elizabeth Yanni added to party Navigators Insurance Company, a New York corporation (pty:dft))(Yanni, Rebekah) |
|
Att: 1 48 pgs Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal of Action (28 U.S.C. Section 1441(b)), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 to Request for Judicial Notice | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 03/13 1:07 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Navigators Insurance Company, Does 1 through 20 inclusive, filed by Plaintiff National Association of Television Program Executives, Inc. Filed in State Court on 10/3/2022 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal1 . (car) |