California Central District Court
Judge:Virginia A Phillips
Referred: Rozella A Oliver
Case #: 2:23-cv-01806
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2023
Terminated:Jun 06, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 2:48 AM PDT
Defendant
Bluebird Provisions Inc.
Represented By
John Michael Genga
Genga And Associates, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Connor Meakin
Represented By
John Michael Genga
Genga And Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Dr Kellyann LLC
Represented By
Kamran Fattahi
Kamran Fattahi Law Offices
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
20 20 misc Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120) Wed 06/07 9:37 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (lc)
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 06/07 9:35 AM
ORDER UPON STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE18 by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: 1. All claims and any counterclaims by all parties in this action are dismissed with prejudice. 2. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees incurred in this action. 3. This Court shall retain exclusive jurisdiction over any action or motion relating to the breach or enforcement of the confidential "Settlement Agreement" between the parties.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
18 18 stip Dismiss Case Thu 06/01 4:42 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement filed by plaintiff Dr Kellyann LLC.(Fattahi, Kamran)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 20, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 04/21 8:57 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Virginia A. Phillips:ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO FILE AO-120 NOTICE14 . On April 11, 2023, Plaintiff filed its required AO-120 notice with the Court15 . Accordingly, the Court hereby vacates its April 6, 2023, order to show cause. (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
16 16 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 04/19 11:54 PM
Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Connor Meakin answer now due 5/5/2023; Bluebird Provisions Inc. answer now due 5/5/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants Connor Meakin; Bluebird Provisions Inc..(Attorney John Michael Genga added to party Connor Meakin(pty:dft))(Genga, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
15 15 misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Tue 04/11 4:24 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Dr Kellyann LLC. (Fattahi, Kamran)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
14 14 2 pgs order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/06 4:31 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO FILE FORM AO-12011 . On March 13, 2023, this Court instructed Plaintiffs counsel to provide the Clerk with an original and two copies of the required AO-120 notice within ten days. As of the date of this Order, Plaintiff has yet to file these required documents with the Court. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause, in writing, no later than 4:00 p.m. on April 17, 2023, why the Court should not dismiss this case for failure to file an AO-120 notice as required under the Local Rules. Alternatively, Plaintiff may provide this Court with the original and two copies of its AO-120 notice to the Patent and Trademark Office by 4:00 p.m. on April 17, 2023. Failure to file a timely response to this Order will result in dismissal of this action. (lc)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 01, 2023
13 13 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Sat 04/01 4:36 PM
First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants Bluebird Provisions Inc..(Attorney John Michael Genga added to party Bluebird Provisions Inc.(pty:dft))(Genga, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
12 12 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 03/13 1:09 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (hc)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Copyright/Patent/Trademark (CV-31) (Notice to Counsel) - optional html form Mon 03/13 10:29 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (car)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/13 10:27 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Connor Meakin. (car)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/13 10:25 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Bluebird Provisions Inc.. (car)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 03/13 10:11 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 03/13 10:11 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 03/13 10:10 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
5 5 notice Summons Request Fri 03/10 4:44 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff Dr Kellyann LLC. (Fattahi, Kamran)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Fri 03/10 4:40 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff Dr Kellyann LLC. (Fattahi, Kamran)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 03/10 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Dr Kellyann LLC, (Fattahi, Kamran)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 03/10 2:41 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dr Kellyann LLC. (Fattahi, Kamran)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/10 11:51 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34934101 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Dr Kellyann LLC. (Attorney Kamran Fattahi added to party Dr Kellyann LLC(pty:pla))(Fattahi, Kamran)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. 5