Kimberly Frazier v. La Brea Gardens Property, LLC
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John F Walter |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01808 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 07, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 2:34 AM PDT |
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Defendant
La Brea Gardens Property, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Frazier
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, July 07, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 07/07 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Frazier. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Declaration
Wed 03/22 1:33 PM
DECLARATION of JASON J. KIM re: Lead Trial Counsel filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Frazier. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 03/13 12:41 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/10 4:29 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant La Brea Gardens Property, LLC. (jtil) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Fri 03/10 12:55 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/10 12:55 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/10 12:54 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/10 12:20 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Kimberly Frazier. (Kim, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/10 12:20 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/10 12:19 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Frazier. (Kim, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/10 12:19 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34934711 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Kimberly Frazier(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) |