California Central District Court
Judge:Josephine L Staton
Referred: Patricia Donahue
Case #: 2:23-cv-01807
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2023
Terminated:Feb 08, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 2:21 AM PDT
Defendant
Allegacy Federal Credit Union
Represented By
Sara Emily Franks
Hinshaw And Culbertson LLP
contact info
Justin M Penn
Hinshaw And Culbertson LLP
contact info
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Allan Goodman
Represented By
Allan J. Goodman
Adr Services, Inc. C/o Allan Goodman
contact info
Plaintiff
Marco Rastelli
Represented By
Michael J. Plati
Consumer Attorneys PLC
contact info
Lauren Tegan Rodkey
Price Law Group Apc
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Terminated: 07/14/2023
Represented By
Thomas P Quinn, Jr
Nokes And Quinn Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 30 minutes ago
Thursday, February 08, 2024
38 38 order Dismissing Case Thu 02/08 6:24 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE37 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. The parties' Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Allegacy Federal Credit Union (Doc.37 ) is GRANTED. The above-entitled matter is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Defendant Allegacy Federal Credit Union. As there are no remaining defendants, this matter is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice and is closed. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
37 37 stip Dismiss Case Fri 02/02 2:01 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Marco Rastelli.(Plati, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 02, 2023
36 36 notice Settlement Thu 11/02 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Allegacy Federal Credit Union filed by Plaintiff Marco Rastelli. (Plati, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
35 35 order Protective Order Tue 10/24 1:45 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue re Stipulation for Protective Order34 . See document for details. (es)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
34 34 stip Protective Order Mon 10/23 4:07 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Marco Rastelli.(Plati, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
33 33 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 09/26 1:42 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Counsel and/or the parties are advised that the Court has updated its procedures in civil cases, including procedures encouraging consent to the magistrate judge in ordinary civil cases; setting forth presumptive schedules for class certification motion briefing; simplifying the requirements for substituting named defendants for Doe defendants; clarifying requirements for submission of mandatory chambers copies of voluminous exhibits; substituting compliance with the Local Rule regarding limitations on the number of words in the parties briefing for the Courts previous page limitations on briefing; imposing further limitations on the number of words in reply briefs; updating the Courts procedures in the case of settlement, including procedures for orders imposing stays of proceedings, orders of dismissal, and retention of jurisdiction by the Court; imposing limitations on both the number of and the content of motions in limine; and clarifying trial exhibit preparation, including the requirement to prepare a separate binder of exhibits for each witness. These updates are found on the Courts procedures page, and/or the Courts Initial Standing Order and Civil Trial Order, attached thereto. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
32 32 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Fri 07/28 7:59 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Allan Goodman has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
31 31 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2) Thu 07/27 4:29 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Honorable Allan J. Goodman may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. All parties and the Panel Mediator have agreed that the mediation will be held on 11/10/2023 and counsel will submit mediation statements seven (7) calendar days before the session. Filed by Plaintiff Marco Rastelli(Plati, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
30 30 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 07/14 4:52 PM
ORDER GRANTING Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC Only (Doc.29 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
29 29 stip Dismiss Party Mon 07/10 2:42 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC filed by Plaintiff Marco Rastelli.(Rodkey, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, July 06, 2023
28 28 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Thu 07/06 4:53 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 3/8/2024. (jp)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Thu 07/06 4:42 PM
CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (kti)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 03, 2023
25 25 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 07/05 9:37 AM
ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton GRANTING23 Non-Resident Attorney Michael J Plati APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Marco Rastelli, designating Lauren T Rodkey as local counsel. (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
26 26 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 07/05 3:37 PM
MINUTES (In Chambers) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report. (Doc.22 ). On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing 7/7/2023 is VACATED and the following schedule is set. Last Day to File a Motion to Add Parties or Amend Pleadings: 9/1/2023. Fact Discovery Cutoff: 12/29/2023. Last Day to File Motions (Excluding Daubert Motions and all other Motions in Limine): 1/12/2024. Last Day to Serve Initial Expert Reports: 1/12/2024. Last Day to Serve Rebuttal Expert Reports: 2/9/2024. Expert Discovery Cutoff: 3/1/2024. Last Day to Conduct Settlement Proceedings: 3/8/2024. Last Day to File Daubert Motions: 3/15/2024. Last Day to File Motions in Limine: 8/2/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/30/2024 at 10:30 AM. (See document for further information). (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
24 24 motion Leave Tue 06/27 12:43 PM
Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Appear Remotely at the Scheduling Conference on July 7, 2023 filed by Plaintiff Marco Rastelli. (Rodkey, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, June 26, 2023
23 23 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Mon 06/26 12:39 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Plati to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Marco Rastelli (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35556054) filed by Plaintiff Marco Rastelli. (Rodkey, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Michael Plati AZ Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, June 23, 2023
22 22 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 06/23 1:21 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Marco Rastelli..(Rodkey, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Proposed Scheduling Order
Thursday, May 18, 2023
21 21 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 05/18 1:39 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 7/7/2023 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (vv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 05/17 11:15 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Allegacy Federal Credit Union.(Attorney Justin M Penn added to party Allegacy Federal Credit Union(pty:dft))(Penn, Justin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
19 19 notice Settlement Thu 05/11 1:06 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC Only filed by Plaintiff Marco Rastelli. (Rodkey, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
18 18 order Extending Answer Due Deadline ~Util - Terminate Deadlines Wed 05/03 4:03 PM
ORDER GRANTING Motion for an Extension of Time for Defendant Allegacy Federal Credit Union to File a Responsive Pleading (Doc.17 ) and DISCHARGING Order to Show Cause (Doc.16 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Allegacy Federal Credit Union shall answer Plaintiffs Complaint or otherwise plead on or before 5/15/2023. (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
17 17 misc Miscellaneous Document Thu 04/27 1:43 PM
Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause (Doc. 16) and Motion for an Extension of Time for Defendant Allegacy Federal Credit Union to File A Responsive Pleading filed by Plaintiff Marco Rastelli re: Order to Show Cause,16(Rodkey, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 20, 2023
16 16 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 04/20 1:22 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff, to show cause in writing no later than 4/27/2023, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to defendant Allegacy Federal Credit Union. (See document for further information). (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
15 15 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 04/14 9:20 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC, identifying Equifax Inc.. (Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
14 14 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Fri 04/14 9:19 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Equifax Information Services, LLC answer now due 5/5/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Attorney Thomas P Quinn, Jr added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
13 13 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 04/06 4:02 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marco Rastelli, upon Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 3/24/2023, answer due 4/14/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Alisha Smith, Process Coordinator in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Rodkey, Lauren)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 04/06 3:58 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marco Rastelli, upon Defendant Allegacy Federal Credit Union served on 3/27/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Justin Smith, AVP Corporate Real Estate in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Rodkey, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 11, 2023
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Sat 03/11 4:09 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (kmh)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
10 10 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/10 3:45 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (ghap)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/10 3:44 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Allegacy Federal Credit Union. (ghap)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 03/10 3:37 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 03/10 3:37 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 03/10 3:36 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 03/10 12:31 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Marco Rastelli, identifying None. (Rodkey, Lauren)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Fri 03/10 12:28 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Marco Rastelli. (Rodkey, Lauren)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Fri 03/10 12:27 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Marco Rastelli. (Rodkey, Lauren)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 03/10 12:24 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Marco Rastelli. (Rodkey, Lauren)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/10 12:22 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34934727 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Marco Rastelli. (Attorney Lauren Tegan Rodkey added to party Marco Rastelli(pty:pla))(Rodkey, Lauren)
Related: [-]