California Central District Court
Judge:Josephine L Staton
Referred: Charles F Eick
Case #: 2:23-cv-01815
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2023
Terminated:Jul 26, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 1:52 AM PDT
Defendant
Joyce Cooper
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Kevin Cox
Represented By
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
17 17 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Wed 07/26 7:25 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Kevin Cox. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
16 16 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 07/18 3:14 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff's counsel, to show cause in writing no later than 7/26/2023, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See document for further information). (jp)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Tue 07/18 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Telephone Conference,14 Due to docketing error, the Minutes of Telephonic Status Conference filed by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero, was docketed on the wrong case. The correct case should read: CV23-1813 ODW (MAAx) (es)
Related: [-]
14 14 minutes Telephone Conference Tue 07/18 2:37 PM
[NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED 07/18/2023 SEE DKT.15 ] MINUTES OF (Telephonic): Status Conference (ECF No. 40) held before Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero: The Court convened this Status Conference to address (1) the issue raised by Defendants that the Motion is premature because discovery has not yet commenced, and (2) the issue raised by Panera Bread, Respondent to Plaintiff's subpoena, that it had arranged for compliance with the subpoena on July 7, 2023. (See ECF No. 40.) The Court confers with the parties. Plaintiff makes an oral motion to withdraw the Motion without prejudice to his renewing it, if necessary, after the commencement of discovery. Upon no objection from Defendants, and for good cause shown as stated on the record, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion and DIRECTS the Court Clerk to show the Motion as "WITHDRAWN WITHOUT PREJUDICE PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF." [SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION.] Court Reporter: Court Smart 07/18/23. (es) Modified on 7/18/2023 (es)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
13 13 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Wed 03/29 12:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DECLINING SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION AND DISMISSING STATE-LAW CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Having considered Plaintiff's response12 , the Court finds exercise of supplemental jurisdiction is not warranted under the circumstances. For the foregoing reasons, the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's Unruh Act claim and other state-law claims in this action, and the claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to filing in state court. (lom)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
12 12 misc Response Fri 03/24 9:41 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Kevin Coxto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,11 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
11 11 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Wed 03/15 4:07 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause why the Court should not decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's Unruh Act claim and other state-law claims. Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause, in writing, no later than ten (10) days from the date of this Order, why the Court should not decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's Unruh Act claim and other state-law claims. (lom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
10 10 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Tue 03/14 11:39 AM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (hc)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 03/14 11:33 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO Judge Josephine L. Staton. (hc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/13 10:33 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Joyce Cooper. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 03/13 10:14 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 03/13 10:13 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 03/13 10:13 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
4 4 notice Summons Request Fri 03/10 2:00 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Kevin Cox. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 03/10 2:00 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 03/10 1:59 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kevin Cox. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/10 1:59 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34936226 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Kevin Cox(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]