California Central District Court
Judge:Shashi H Kewalramani
Referred: Shashi H Kewalramani
Case #: 5:23-cv-00422
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2023
Terminated:Sep 22, 2023
Case in other court:Riverside County Superior Court, CVRI2300124
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 2:16 AM PDT
Defendant
DOES
Defendant
Swisslog Logistics, Inc.
Represented By
Fay K. Saechao
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Laura E Hayward
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Fay Kouei Saechao
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Nathaniel H Jenkins
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Cuellar
Represented By
Nithin Kumar
Kingfisher Law Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, September 22, 2023
27 27 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Mon 09/25 3:26 PM
ORDER RE STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case26 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-referenced action is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a). Each party shall bear their own respective attorneys fees and costs incurred in this action. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (et)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
26 26 stip Dismiss Case Wed 09/20 5:26 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Daniel Cuellar.(Kumar, Nithin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
25 25 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 08/08 1:56 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE: ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT ECF No.23 previously scheduled for August 11, 2023 11:00 a.m. has been terminated pursuant to the parties notice of conditional settlement filed on 8/8/23. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dc)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Tue 08/08 12:23 PM
Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Plaintiff Daniel Cuellar. (Kumar, Nithin)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
23 23 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 07/17 3:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: re: Consent to Proceed (CV-11D) before US Magistrate Judge Voluntary Program,22 . The parties consented to proceed to trial before Magistrate Judge Kewalramani. To advance the litigation efficiently, the Court will hold a case management conference on August 11,2023 at 11:00 a.m. (dc)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
22 22 misc Consent to Proceed (CV-11D) before US Magistrate Judge Voluntary Program Fri 07/14 2:36 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before United States Magistrate Judge by all parties pursuant to GO 18-11 is approved by District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. This case is hereby reassigned to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for all further proceedings. Case number will now read 5:23-cv-00422 SHK. (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
21 21 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 05/23 4:40 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Judgment on the Pleadings previously, ECF No.11 schedule for June 6, 2023 11:00 AM has been terminated. At this time, the Court concludes that a hearing on the Motion is not necessary. See C.D.Cal. Local Civ. R. 7-15. The Court may later schedule a hearing if, upon further review, one would be helpful. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dc)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Reply (Motion related) Tue 05/23 2:33 PM
REPLY in support of motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Judgment on the Pleadings 11 filed by Defendant Swisslog Logistics, Inc.. (Jenkins, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
19 19 respm Declaration (Motion related) Wed 05/17 2:18 AM
DECLARATION of Nithin Kumar in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Judgment on the Pleadings 11 filed by Plaintiff Daniel Cuellar. (Kumar, Nithin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 05/16 11:56 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Judgment on the Pleadings 11 filed by Plaintiff Daniel Cuellar. (Kumar, Nithin)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
17 17 notice Notice of Lodging Fri 05/12 11:49 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form6(Kumar, Nithin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge
Thursday, May 11, 2023
16 16 misc Statement Thu 05/11 2:36 PM
STATEMENT Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Swisslog Logistics, Inc. (Jenkins, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
15 15 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Tue 05/09 4:23 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) 8 , 10 . The documents are STRICKEN. Counsel may file the proper form CV-11D no later than May 12, 2023. By Judge Jesus G. Bernal. IT IS SO ORDERED. (mga)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
14 14 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 04/17 10:35 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Wrong event and form used, the correct event is "Notice">"Notice of Lodging" and the correct form CV 11D form has to be attached. Please refer to General Order 18-11. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 04/17 10:33 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Wrong event and form used, the correct event is "Notice">"Notice of Lodging" and the correct form CV 11D form has to be attached. Please refer to General Order 18-11. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/14 4:12 PM
Notice Request for Judicial Notice filed by Defendant Swisslog Logistics, Inc.. (Jenkins, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Fri 04/14 4:09 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant Swisslog Logistics, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/6/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (Jenkins, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration of Jenkins,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 13, 2023
10 10 misc Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final Thu 04/13 7:35 AM
STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Daniel Cuellar. (Kumar, Nithin)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 04/13 7:33 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Daniel Cuellar, (Kumar, Nithin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
8 8 misc Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final Wed 04/12 2:44 PM
STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Swisslog Logistics, Inc.. (Jenkins, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
7 7 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 03/22 9:51 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 03/14 4:05 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 03/14 4:04 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 03/14 4:04 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
3 3 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Mon 03/13 11:36 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant swisslog Logistics, Inc., re Corporate Disclosure Statement2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 served on 3/10/23. (Jenkins, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/10 1:41 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant swisslog Logistics, Inc. identifying Swisslog USA, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Jenkins, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/10 1:40 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number CVRI2300124 Receipt No: ACACDC-34935856 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant swisslog Logistics, Inc.. (Attorney Nathaniel H Jenkins added to party swisslog Logistics, Inc.(pty:dft))(Jenkins, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 74 pgs Declaration of Jenkins,
Att: 2 Declaration of Bermudez,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 03/14 2:34 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Swisslog Logistics, Inc. in Riverside Superior Court on 1/10/2023, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Tue 03/14 2:48 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendants Swisslog Logistics, Inc in Riverside Superior Court on 3/9/2023, attached as Exhibit C. (jtil)
Related: [-]