California Central District Court
Judge:Cormac J Carney
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:23-cv-00438
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2023
Terminated:Nov 01, 2023
Case in other court:Orange County Superior Court, 30-02023-01306288-CU-
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 2:03 AM PDT
Defendant
Albertsons LLC
Represented By
Michael S Kalt
Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP
contact info
Jennifer Solano
Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP
contact info
Defendant
DOES
Interested Party
ACI
Interested Party
Cerberus Capital Management, L.P.
Interested Party
Funds Affiliated with Lubert-Adler
Interested Party
Klaff Realty, L.P.
Plaintiff
Ramon Fernando Orozco
Represented By
Samvel Geshgian
Law Offices Of Ramin R Yonessi Aplc
contact info
Ramin R Younessi
Law Offices Of Ramin Younessi Aplc
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
15 15 order Dismissing Case Wed 11/01 4:31 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION ON STIPULATION TO DISMISS CASE by Judge Cormac J. Carney, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case14 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (twdb)
Related: [-]
14 14 stip Dismiss Case Wed 11/01 2:59 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement filed by Defendant Albertsons LLC.(Solano, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
13 13 order Protective Order Wed 10/04 7:46 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick re Stipulation for Protective Order12 . See document for details. (es)
Related: [-]
12 12 stip Protective Order Tue 10/03 12:47 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Albertsons LLC.(Solano, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
11 11 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held Tue 05/16 12:40 PM
ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT PROCEDURES, PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (rrp)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Tue 05/16 12:39 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Discovery cut-off 12/21/2023. LAST DATE TO HEAR MOTIONS is 2/19/2024. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 1/4/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 4/22/2024 at 3:00 p.m. Jury Trial set for 4/30/2024 at 8:30 a.m. (rrp)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
9 9 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 05/01 10:59 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Ramon Fernando Orozco.. (Geshgian, Samvel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 03/16 3:06 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Samvel Geshgian counsel for Plaintiff Ramon Fernando Orozco. Adding Samvel Geshgian as counsel of record for Ramon Fernando Orozco for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Ramon Fernando Orozco. (Attorney Samvel Geshgian added to party Ramon Fernando Orozco(pty:pla))(Geshgian, Samvel)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
7 7 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 03/13 9:13 AM
NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on May 11, 2023. (rrp)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 03/10 5:11 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 03/10 5:10 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 03/10 5:10 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 03/10 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ALBERTSONS LLC, identifying Cerberus Capital Management, L.P., Klaff Realty, L.P., Funds Affiliated with Lubert-Adler, ACI.(Solano, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 03/10 3:43 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant ALBERTSONS LLC.(Solano, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
1 1 9 pgs notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/10 3:39 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2023 01306288-CU-WT-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-34936722 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant ALBERTSONS LLC. (Attorney Jennifer Solano added to party ALBERTSONS LLC(pty:dft))(Solano, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 23 pgs Exhibit A to Notice of Removal - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal - Other Pleadings,
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal - Answer to Complaint,
Att: 4 Declaration of Naomi Nakamura-Dees,
Att: 5 Declaration of Jennifer Solano,
Att: 6 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jennifer Solano,
Att: 7 Proof of Service
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 03/10 4:57 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Ramon Fernando Orozco in Orange County Superior Court on 2/6/2023, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Fri 03/10 5:01 PM
NON CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Albertsons LLC, attached as Exhibit C. (jtil)
Related: [-]