Verklas v. National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Richard F Boulware, II |
Referred: | Brenda Weksler |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00381 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2023 |
Terminated: | Dec 21, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 1:45 AM PDT |
Defendant
Innovis Data Solutions, Inc
|
|
Defendant
National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Verklas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, December 21, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order Order on Stipulation
Thu 12/21 9:23 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/21/2023. In light of the parties'28 Stipulation to Dismiss, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and attorney's fees. Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is instructed to close the case. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAW) |
||
Wednesday, December 20, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Stipulation
Wed 12/20 3:14 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL of National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange, Inc. re1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Robert Verklas. (Kind, Michael) (dismissal) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order
Tue 11/28 11:07 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/28/2023. Good cause being found, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties are granted an additional 30 days to file dismissal documents. Clerk status check on 12/27/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAW) |
||
Monday, November 27, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Status Report
Mon 11/27 3:55 PM
Second STATUS REPORT re: Settlement between Robert Verklas and National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange, Inc. by Plaintiff Robert Verklas.. (Kind, Michael) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order
Fri 10/27 11:34 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/27/2023. Good cause being found, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' are granted an additional 30 days to file dismissal documents. Clerk status check on 11/27/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAW) |
||
Thursday, October 26, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Status Report
Thu 10/26 3:11 PM
First STATUS REPORT re: Settlement between Robert Verklas and National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange, Inc. by Plaintiff Robert Verklas.. (Kind, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order
Tue 08/29 10:04 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/29/2023. In light of the22 NOTICE of settlement between Plaintiff and National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange, Inc., IT IS ORDERED that the parties file dismissal documents or a joint status report by October 30, 2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAG) |
||
Monday, August 28, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice Other
Mon 08/28 12:25 PM
NOTICE of settlement between Plaintiff and National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange, Inc. by Robert Verklas re1 Complaint,,.. (Kind, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge
Wed 06/28 8:29 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (DLS) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
5
pgs
order
Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Wed 06/28 8:29 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting ECF No.19 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/8/2023 . Dispositive Motions due by 12/8/2023 . Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/8/2024 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/27/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Mon 06/26 2:02 AM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Robert Verklas.. (Kind, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Wed 05/10 1:15 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Marina, Gia) |
|
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 05/10 1:15 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/20/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/24/2023.(Marina, Gia) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time
Fri 05/05 10:42 AM
ORDER granting ECF No.15 Motion to Extend Time: National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange response/answer to ECF No.1 Complaint due 5/11/2023 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/4/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Motion Extend/Shorten Time
Wed 05/03 11:13 AM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to answer re1 Complaint,, by Defendant National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange. Responses due by 5/17/2023. (Marina, Gia) (answer) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 04/27 5:43 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Robert Verklas. Dismissing Innovis Data Solutions, Inc . (Kind, Michael) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order
Fri 03/31 12:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/31/2023. In light of the10 NOTICE of Withdrawal, IT IS ORDERED that the Courts 12 Order is Vacated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CVL) |
||
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 03/30 10:01 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Verklas re6 Summons Issued. National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange served on 3/21/2023. (Kind, Michael) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice Other
Thu 03/30 9:51 AM
NOTICE of withdrawal of documents ECF Nos. 8 and 9 by Robert Verklas re8 Notice (Other),9 Notice of Corrected Image/Document.. (Kind, Michael) |
|
minord
Minute Order
Thu 03/30 12:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/30/2023. In light of the filing of8 Notice of Settlement, IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file settlement documents, stipulation for dismissal or joint status report within 60 days. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CVL) |
||
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice Corrected Image/Document
Wed 03/29 5:02 PM
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re8 Notice (Other) by Plaintiff Robert Verklas. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Kind, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice Other
Wed 03/29 4:33 PM
NOTICE of settlement between Plaintiff and National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange, Inc. by Robert Verklas re1 Complaint,,.. (Kind, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 03/21 9:51 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Verklas re6 Summons Issued. Innovis Data Solutions, Inc waiver sent on 3/13/2023, answer due 5/12/2023. (Kind, Michael) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/10 3:11 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Innovis Data Solutions, Inc, National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange. (JQC) |
|
5 | 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) | |
4 | 4
notice
Notice Corrected Image/Document
Fri 03/10 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Plaintiff Robert Verklas. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Kind, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice Corrected Image/Document
Fri 03/10 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Robert Verklas. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Kind, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Fri 03/10 2:52 PM
View Corrected Image at 4 : CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Robert Verklas. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kind, Michael) Modified on 3/10/2023 (DRS) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/10 2:52 PM
View Corrected Image at 3 : COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7232787) by Robert Verklas. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/20/2023. Proof of service due by 6/8/2023. (Kind, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 3/10/2023 (DRS) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Fri 03/10 3:08 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JQC) |
||
order
Standing Order
Fri 03/10 3:09 PM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |