Carpenter v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Susan O Hickey |
Referred: | Christy D Comstock |
Case #: | 6:23-cv-06027 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI) |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2023 |
Terminated: | Dec 01, 2023 |
Defendant
Social Security Administration Commissioner
|
|
Interested Party
Social Security Administration-Office of General Counsel
|
|
Plaintiff
Brenda Carpenter
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, February 02, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() ORDER adopting23 Report and Recommendations in toto and GRANTING20 Motion for Attorney Fees; Plaintiff is hereby awarded the sum of $5,133.00 for attorneys fees with this amount paid in addition to, and not out of, any past due benefits which Plaintiff may be awarded in the future. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 2, 2024. (tmc) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
![]() REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re20 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Brenda Carpenter. Objections to R&R due by 1/17/2024. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on January 3, 2024. (jlm) |
|
Wednesday, December 27, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
![]() REPLY to Response to Motion re20 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Brenda Carpenter. (Schulze, James) |
|
21 | 21
![]() OBJECTION(S) by Social Security Administration Commissioner re20 MOTION for Attorney Fees . (Chainani, Tracey) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2023 | ||
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
Fri 12/22 11:05 AM
CASE REFERRED to Honorable Christy D. Comstock. Motions referred to Honorable Christy D. Comstock.(jlm) |
||
Thursday, December 21, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
![]() MOTION for Attorney Fees by Brenda Carpenter.(Schulze, James) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, December 01, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER adopting the Report and Recommendation18 in toto. The Commissioners Unopposed Motion for Reversal and Remand Pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g)16 is hereby GRANTED. The Administrative Law Judges decision is hereby REVERSED, and this case is hereby REMANDED to the Commissioner for further administrative action pursuant to Sentence Four of section 405(g). Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 1, 2023. (jlm) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re2 Complaint filed by Brenda Carpenter and16 Unopposed MOTION to Remand filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Objections to R&R due by 11/27/2023. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on November 13, 2023. (tmc) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of16 Unopposed MOTION to Remand by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Chainani, Tracey) |
|
16 | 16
![]() Unopposed MOTION to Remand by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Motions referred to Christy D. Comstock.(Chainani, Tracey) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to File ( Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 11/12/2023). Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on October 11, 2023. (tmc) |
|
14 | 14
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Brief by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Motions referred to Christy D. Comstock.(Chainani, Tracey) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey Chainani on behalf of Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Chainani, Tracey) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Brenda Carpenter. (Schulze, James) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Social Security Scheduling Order - CDC
Fri 08/18 10:12 AM
TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. The parties' briefs shall not contain a recitation of the procedural history, evidence, or standard of review. Plaintiffs brief shall be limited solely to the specific points for appeal and a discussion of the pertinent evidence as related to those points (including transcript page citations for this evidence). Defendants brief shall address the issues raised in Plaintiffs brief and may include additional relevant issues, with a discussion of the pertinent evidence as related to these issues (including transcript page citations for this evidence). A reply brief may be filed within fourteen (14) days after the response brief is filed, and shall be limited to those issues raised in the response brief that were not previously addressed. All briefs must include citations to applicable case-law supporting the parties' positions. No extension of time to file a brief will be granted unless it is timely and establishes good cause for an extension. The briefs should be no longer than ten (10) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 9/18/2023. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on August 18, 2023. (caz) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Taylor, Candace) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Tuesday, July 11, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ORDER granting8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 Complaint ; Social Security Administration Commissioner answer due 9/11/2023. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on July 11, 2023. (tmc) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Motions referred to Christy D. Comstock.(Curtis, Kizuwanda) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER granting6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 Complaint. Social Security Administration Commissioner shall file the electronic certified administrative record by no later than, July 11, 2023. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on May 10, 2023. (tmc) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Motions referred to Christy D. Comstock.(Curtis, Kizuwanda) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
utility
Memo of Reassignment
Mon 04/24 12:35 PM
TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case referral reassigned to Honorable Christy D. Comstock. Honorable Barry A Bryant no longer assigned to the case. (hnc) |
||
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
misc
Clerk's Order of Judge Assignment
Fri 03/24 1:29 PM
TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT to a District Judge. Case reassigned to presiding judge Honorable Susan O. Hickey and Honorable Barry A Bryant, as the referral judge. (bjb) |
||
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on March 10, 2023. (tmc) |
|
service
Affidavit of Service as to USA
Mon 03/13 9:48 AM
Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 3/10/2023, answer due 5/9/2023. (tmc) |
||
service
Affidavit of Service as to USA
Mon 03/13 2:09 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service: Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 3/13/2023, answer due 5/12/2023. (lgd) |
||
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 3/24/2023.(tmc) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brenda Carpenter. (tmc) |
|
2 | 2
![]() COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Brenda Carpenter.(tmc) |
|
1 | 1
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET by Brenda Carpenter. (tmc) |