California Central District Court
Judge:Josephine L Staton
Referred: Sheri Pym
Case #: 2:23-cv-01827
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2023
Terminated:May 17, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 1:59 AM PDT
Defendant
Dir LA Asylum Ofc
Represented By
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Siu P. Wong
U.S. Dept. Of Justice, Civil Division, Oil
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Ernesto Molina
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Dir LA Dist
Represented By
Siu P. Wong
U.S. Dept. Of Justice, Civil Division, Oil
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Ernesto Molina
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Dir USCIS
Represented By
Siu P. Wong
U.S. Dept. Of Justice, Civil Division, Oil
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Ernesto Molina
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Sec DHS
Represented By
Siu P. Wong
U.S. Dept. Of Justice, Civil Division, Oil
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Ernesto Molina
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
US AG
Represented By
Siu P. Wong
U.S. Dept. Of Justice, Civil Division, Oil
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Ernesto Molina
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
USCIS
Represented By
Siu P. Wong
U.S. Dept. Of Justice, Civil Division, Oil
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Ernesto Molina
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Zhanyun Ma
Represented By
Ke Ye
Mino Law Group Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, February 23, 2024
25 25 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 02/23 2:37 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Zhanyun Ma. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 17, 2023
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Sat 06/17 4:31 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Oil Oil counsel for Defendant Dir LA Asylum Ofc. Adding Ernesto Horacio Molina, Jr. as counsel of record for Dir LA Asylum Ofc et al for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants Dir LA Asylum Ofc et al. (Attorney Oil Oil added to party Dir LA Asylum Ofc(pty:dft))(Oil, Oil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
23 23 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 05/17 4:39 PM
ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Stay Pending Adjudication of Asylum Application (Doc.22 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton that the instant action shall be stayed until 3/1/2024. No later than that date, Plaintiff shall file a notice of dismissal or status report in the action. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
22 22 stip Stay Case Fri 05/12 4:07 PM
Corrected STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Adjudication of asylum application filed by defendants Dir LA Asylum Ofc.(Wong, Siu)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order to stay case (Corrected)
21 21 stip Stay Case Fri 05/12 3:27 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Adjudication of asylum application filed by defendants Dir LA Asylum Ofc.(Wong, Siu)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order for joint stipulation for a stay
Monday, May 08, 2023
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 05/08 3:24 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Siu P. Wong counsel for Defendant Dir LA Asylum Ofc. Adding Siu P. Wong as counsel of record for DIR LA ASYLUM OFC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Siu P. Wong. (Attorney Siu P. Wong added to party Dir LA Asylum Ofc(pty:dft))(Wong, Siu)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
19 19 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Mon 03/27 12:28 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Zhanyun Ma, upon Defendant US AG served on 3/27/2023, answer due 5/26/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Mon 03/27 12:27 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Zhanyun Ma, upon Defendant Sec DHS served on 3/27/2023, answer due 5/26/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Mon 03/27 12:24 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Zhanyun Ma, upon Defendant Dir USCIS served on 3/22/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Mon 03/27 12:19 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Zhanyun Ma, upon Defendant USCIS served on 3/20/2023, answer due 5/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Mon 03/27 11:59 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Zhanyun Ma, upon Defendant Dir LA Dist served on 3/16/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Mon 03/27 11:51 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Zhanyun Ma, upon Defendant Dir LA Asylum Ofc served on 3/15/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Lodging Thu 03/23 4:20 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form6(Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Consent to Magistrate Judge
Friday, March 17, 2023
12 12 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 03/17 11:26 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (vv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
11 11 order Transferring Case purs GO 21-01 (Related Case)(CV-34) Thu 03/16 8:22 AM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:23-cv-01092 JLS(SPx). Case transferred from Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi to Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:2-cv-01827 JLS(SPx). Signed by Judge Josephine L. Staton (rn)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 03/13 2:05 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Exhibit (non-trial) Mon 03/13 12:02 PM
EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiff Zhanyun Ma. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Errata Mon 03/13 11:54 AM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Zhanyun Ma. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/13 10:38 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Dir LA Asylum Ofc, Dir LA Dist, Dir USCIS, Sec DHS, US AG, USCIS. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 03/13 10:17 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 03/13 10:17 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
4 4 notice Summons Request Fri 03/10 4:08 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Zhanyun Ma. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 03/10 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Zhanyun Ma, (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 03/10 4:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Zhanyun Ma. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/10 4:03 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34938086 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Zhanyun Ma. (Attorney Ke Ye added to party Zhanyun Ma(pty:pla))(Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit to Complaint