California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:23-cv-01822
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2023
Terminated:Feb 16, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 2:21 AM PDT
Defendant
DGL Group LTD.
Represented By
Rachele R Byrd
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Alex Joseph Tramontano
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Benjamin Y. Kaufman
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
M. Anderson Berry
Clayeo Arnold Aplc
contact info
Lillian R. Grinnell
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mark Nakash
Represented By
Rachele R Byrd
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Alex Joseph Tramontano
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Benjamin Y. Kaufman
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
M. Anderson Berry
Clayeo Arnold Aplc
contact info
Lillian R. Grinnell
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ezra Zaafarani
Represented By
Rachele R Byrd
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Alex Joseph Tramontano
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Benjamin Y. Kaufman
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
M. Anderson Berry
Clayeo Arnold Aplc
contact info
Lillian R. Grinnell
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Defendant
DOES
Represented By
Rachele R Byrd
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Lillian R. Grinnell
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Richard R. Mainland
Represented By
Richard R Mainland
Fulbright And Jaworski
contact info
Plaintiff
Universal Freight Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Joon Song
L And F Brown PC
contact info
Jeremy Wang
L And F Brown, P.C.
contact info
Joyce Hahn Ma
L And F Brown PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
78 78 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Wed 09/11 9:21 AM
ORDER APPROVING FOURTH STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING77 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Case70 to October 25, 2024, at 1:30 p.m. No further continuances will be granted absent a strong showing of good cause. (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
77 77 stip Continue Fri 09/06 2:05 PM
Fourth STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Reopen Case from 09/27/2024 to 12/27/2024 Re: Stipulation to Continue,75 filed by Defendants DGL Group LTD., Mark Nakash, Ezra Zaafarani.(Tramontano, Alex)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order