Paul Sapan v. Miranda Holdings, L.L.C.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | Karen E Scott |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00440 |
Nature of Suit | 485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Cause | 47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 21, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 5:11 PM PDT |
Defendant
Miranda Holdings, L.L.C.
|
|
Plaintiff
Paul Sapan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, April 21, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 04/21 9:16 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION ON NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court, having been advised by the plaintiff that th is action has been resolved by a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal9 , hereby orders th is action dismissed with prejudice. The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case vacated and taken off calendar. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Thu 04/20 5:57 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Paul Sapan. Dismissal is with prejudice. |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 9:18 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Miranda Holdings, L.L.C. (lh) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/13 9:13 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/13 9:13 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/13 9:12 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/10 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/10 3:52 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Paul Sapan. |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/10 3:52 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Paul Sapan. |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/10 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34937922 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Paul Sapan. (Attorney Christopher J Reichman added to party Paul Sapan(pty:pla)) |