Oregon District Court
Case #: 3:23-mj-00038
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2023
Terminated:Mar 09, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 11, 2023 11:26 PM PST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Leah K. Bolstad
Us Attorney'S Office, District Of Oregon
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Dustin Erhardt (1)
Terminated: 03/09/2023
Represented By
Mark P. Ahlemeyer
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/12/2023 12:56 AM PST
Thursday, March 09, 2023
1 1 Documents Received From Other Court as to Dustin Erhardt from District of Utah (Central) Case No: 2:20-cr-00045-CW-1. (dino)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minutes of Proceedings: Initial Appearance pursuant to Rule 40 Proceedings before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey Armistead as to Dustin Erhardt (USM #81800-065) held on 3/9/2023. Defendant waived an in-person appearance and consented to appear by video from USM lockup. Defendant advised of rights. Order Appointing Counsel Mark P. Ahlemeyer for Dustin Erhardt in this District. Defendant advised of charges and waived reading of the charges. Defendant waived preliminary/identity hearing. ORDER - Defendant is detained. (Commitment to Another District to follow.) Other Court Information: USA v. Dustin Erhardt, Case No. 2:20-cr-00045-CW-1. Counsel Present for Government: Leah Bolstad. Counsel Present for Defendant: Mark Ahlemeyer. Restraint Order: NR. (Court Reporter Kellie Humiston) (pjg)
Related: [-]
4 4 Waiver of Rule 5 and 5.1 Hearings by Dustin Erhardt. (dino)
Related: [-]
5 5 Commitment to Another District as to Dustin Erhardt. Defendant committed to the District of Utah, Case Number 2:20-cr-00045-CW-1, and Notice to of Criminal Case Transfer as to Dustin Erhardt. Docket sheet and documents attached. Related [+] (One original and two certified copies forwarded to U.S. Marshal on 3/9/2023.) (dino)
Related: [-] ceiving Court: Request certified copies of any documents by e-mailing CrimPDX@ord.uscourts.gov. If a different email address for future transfers should be designated, send a request to InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov.
Att: 1 Docket sheet and supporting documents