Texas Western District Court
Judge:Orlando L Garcia
Case #: 5:23-cv-00304
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Foreclosure
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2023
Terminated:Apr 20, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 5:31 AM CDT
Defendant
Village Capital & Investment, LLC
JACK OBOYLE & ASSOCIATES, PLLC PO BOX 815369
DALLAS, TX 75381
Represented By
Travis H. Gray
Jack O'Boyle & Associates
contact info
Christopher S. Ferguson
Jack O'Boyle And Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Reyes
Represented By
Dana Kimberli Wallace
D. Kimberli Wallace, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago
Thursday, April 20, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 04/20 2:35 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE--IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that all claims asserted by Plaintiff against Defendant in the above-entitled and numbered action are hereby dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (nm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
7 7 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 04/19 12:19 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Village Capital & Investment, LLC.(Gray, Travis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 20, 2023
6 6 motion Summary Judgment Mon 03/20 12:55 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Village Capital & Investment, LLC.(Gray, Travis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
5 5 2 pgs order Order Tue 03/14 1:28 PM
ORDER AND ADVISORY--It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) as required by Fed.R.Civ.P 26(f) and Local Court Rule CV-16(c) to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. The parties are hereby ORDERED to notify the Court whether or not they consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (nm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
4 4 misc Pro Hac Vice Letter Mon 03/13 1:25 PM
Pro Hac Vice Letter forwarded to atty: D. Kimberli Wallace. (wg)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice Mon 03/13 12:56 PM
NOTICE NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Village Capital & Investment, LLC (Gray, Travis)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 12, 2023
2 2 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Sun 03/12 4:22 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Village Capital & Investment, LLC. (Gray, Travis)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Sun 03/12 9:44 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Village Capital & Investment, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ATXWDC-17187536), filed by Village Capital & Investment, LLC.(Gray, Travis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/13 10:36 AM
Case assigned to Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Mon 03/13 10:37 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (wg)
Related: [-]