Original Case: 1:18-cv-05587

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-01450
Typecivil / us
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2023
Terminated:Mar 23, 2023
Last checked: Friday Mar 24, 2023 3:32 AM CDT
Appellant
BC57, LLC
Represented By
Andrew Richard DeVooght
LOEB & LOEB LLP
contact info
Alexandra Schaller
LOEB & LOEB LLP
contact info
Appellee
KEVIN B. DUFF
Represented By
Michael Rachlis
RACHLIS, DUFF, ADLER & PEEL LLC
contact info
Defendant
EQUITYBUILD, INC.
Represented By
Jonathan Gardner
LABATON SUCHAROW LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By
Michael Andrew Conley
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/24/2023 3:28 AM CDT
Friday, March 10, 2023
1 1 U.S. civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 03/24/2023. Appellant's brief due on or before 04/19/2023 for BC57, LLC. [1] [7296637] 23-1450 (CG) [Entered: 03/10/2023 12:33 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 218 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court