Cooper v. Rosemond et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Joan A Lenard |
Referred: | Lauren Fleischer Louis |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-20971 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 6:55 AM EDT |
Defendant
CITY OF MIAMI
a Florida political subdivision 444 SW 2ND AVENUE
MIAMI, FL 33130 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Constant Rosemond
Miami, FL 33128
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Circuit Judge Norman S. Gerstein
|
|
Plaintiff
Talisha Cooper
Miami, FL 33131
|
Represented By
|
1. | Federal lawsuit filed in fatal police shooting of Antwon Cooper (ktvz.com) |
Submitted Tue 03/14/2023 | |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, April 21, 2025 | ||
125 | 125
appeal
Acknowledgment of Receipt from USCA
Mon 04/21 3:24 PM
Acknowledgment of Receipt of ROA from USCA re115 Notice of Appeal, filed by Talisha Cooper. Record on Appeal Received: DE121 - USB Drive. Date received by USCA: 4/21/2025. USCA Case Number: 24-12190 JJ. (apz) |
|
Thursday, April 17, 2025 | ||
124 | 124
![]() Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals (Atlanta Office) consisting of (1) envelope containing DE121 - USB Drive re115 Notice of Appeal. USCA 24-12190 JJ. (apz) |
|
Tuesday, April 15, 2025 | ||
123 | 123
appeal
Electronic Availability of ROA
Tue 04/15 4:13 PM
AMENDED - Pursuant to 11th Cir. R. 11-2 and 11th Cir. R. 11-3, the Clerk of the District Court for the Southern District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re:115 Notice of Appeal, Appeal No. 24-12190 JJ. The record on appeal is available electronically with the exception of: DE121 USB Drive, which is being forwarded via mail to the USCA for the Eleventh Circuit. (apz) |