California Central District Court
Judge:Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpo
Referred: Jacqueline Chooljian
Case #: 2:23-cv-01831
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2023
Terminated:Jan 04, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 2:38 AM PDT
Defendant
L & J Meats, LLC
Plaintiff
Prepared Food Photos, Inc.
Represented By
Scott Edward Radcliffe
Alves Radcliffe LLP
contact info
Lauren M. Hausman
Copycat Legal PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, January 04, 2024
31 31 misc Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121) Mon 01/08 5:24 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (yl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Dismissal
30 30 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Thu 01/04 1:28 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Prepared Food Photos, Inc.. Dismissal is With prejudice. (Hausman, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
29 29 minutes Settlement Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 12/05 4:30 PM
MINUTES OF FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. The parties conferred with the Court and reached a confidential settlement. It is anticipated that the parties will execute a written agreement and file a dismissal within thirty (30) days. (hr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
28 28 minutes Settlement Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 12/01 9:31 AM
MINUTES OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. The Court conferred with counsel and the parties. The case did not settle this date but the settlement discussions are ongoing and the Court scheduled a further Telephonic Settlement Conference for December 5, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. and directed counsel and the parties to call in on such date to the same number utilized for the Telephonic Settlement Conference this date. (hr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
27 27 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 10/20 11:32 AM
ORDER RE TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. The Telephonic Settlement Conference is placed on calendar for November 30, 2023 at 9:30 a.m. (see document for further details) (hr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
26 26 minutes Motion Hearing Default Judgment Fri 10/06 3:47 PM
MOTION HEARING (Held and Completed) before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Court and counsel confer re: Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff15 and Motion for Default Final Judgment, Permanent Injunction, Civil Monetary Penalty, and Other Equitable Relief filed by Plaintiff Prepared Food Photos, Inc.16 The Motions for Default Judgment are DENIED with prejudice. The Court refers the matter to the assigned magistrate judge for settlement conference. (See document for further details) Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (yl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
25 25 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 09/20 9:29 AM
AMENDED TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court resets the time of the Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant L & J Meats, LLC d/b/a Mannings Meat15 to 10 am on 09/21/2023. Counsel shall take notice of this new time. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
24 24 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 09/19 10:59 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court hereby advances the time of the Zoom Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant L & J Meats, LLC d/b/a Mannings Meat filed by Plaintiff Prepared Food Photos, Inc.15 and the Motion for Default Final Judgment, Permanent Injunction, Civil Monetary Penalty, and Other Equitable Relief filed by Plaintiff Prepared Food Photos, Inc.16 to 9:00 am on 09/21/2023. Counsel shall take notice of this advanced time. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
23 23 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 09/18 10:24 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court, having considered Plaintiff's Request (ECF No.22 ) and finding good cause therefor, hereby GRANTS the Request and ORDERS all parties are permitted to appear via Zoom at the hearing set on September 21, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 8B of the First Street Courthouse, 350 West First Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. The Zoom link is found on the Court's website: https://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-maame-ewusi-mensah-frimpong.Prior to the hearing, the parties must consult the Guidelines for Zoom Courtroom Proceedings found on the Court's website. Failure to comply with the Guidelines may result in future requests for Zoom appearances being denied. If Defendant L&J Meats, LLC d/b/a Manning Meats also prefers to appear via Zoom, the Court requests that it provide email notice prior to the hearing at MEMF_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
22 22 motion Appear Mon 08/21 1:06 PM
First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave of Lauren M. Hausman to Appear for Remote PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPEAR VIA ZOOM AT DEFAULT JUDGMENT HEARING filed by Plaintiff Prepared Food Photos, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/21/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Hausman, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
21 21 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Fri 07/28 12:02 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): LETTER FROM HEATHER MANNING [ECF NO.20 ] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court is in receipt of the letter filed by Heather Manning on behalf of Defendant L & J Meats, LLC dba Manning's Meat. ECF No. 20. Manning's Meat is required to comply with Court orders, the Local Rules, and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See C.D. Cal. L.R. 83-2.2.3. The Local Rules are available on the Court's website. The Court ORDERS Heather Manning to appear at the hearing on the Motion for Default Judgment, scheduled for 9/21/2023, at 10:00 a.m. If Heather Manning prefers to appear via Zoom, she should make this request via email and copy the email address of the attorney for Prepared Foods. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
20 20 misc Letter Thu 07/06 4:28 PM
Letter from Heather Manning (rolm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
19 19 notice Appearance Wed 06/21 11:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lauren M. Hausman on behalf of Plaintiff Prepared Food Photos, Inc. (Attorney Lauren M. Hausman added to party Prepared Food Photos, Inc.(pty:pla))(Hausman, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
18 18 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 06/13 10:42 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong.The Court hereby continues the hearing on the Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant L & J Meats, LLC d/b/a Mannings Meat filed by Plaintiff15 and the Motion for Default Final Judgment, Permanent Injunction, Civil Monetary Penalty, and Other Equitable Relief filed by Plaintiff16 to September 21, 2023 at 10:00 AM. Counsel shall take notice of this new date. Any Opposition to the Motion for Default Judgment must be filed, if at all, within 7 days of this order. Any Reply must be filed, if at all, within 7 days of the filing of any Opposition. Plaintiff is ordered to serve this Order on all defendants within 24 hours. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
17 17 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 05/02 2:53 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: The moving party has filed motion(s) for a date that has been closed by this Court. The Court hereby continues the Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant L & J Meats, LLC d/b/a Mannings Meat filed by Plaintiff Prepared Food Photos, Inc.15 and the Motion for Default Final Judgment, Permanent Injunction, Civil Monetary Penalty, and Other Equitable Relief filed by Plaintiff Prepared Food Photos, Inc.16 . to 07/27/2023, at 10:00 AM. Counsel shall take notice of this new date. Closed motion dates can be found on the Court's website at http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-maame-ewusi-mensah-frimpong. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/02 2:34 PM
Notice OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT, PERMANENT INJUNCTION, CIVIL MONETARY PENALTY, AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF filed by Plaintiff Prepared Food Photos, Inc.. (Radcliffe, Scott)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Default Judgment Tue 05/02 2:27 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant L & J Meats, LLC d/b/a Mannings Meat filed by Plaintiff Prepared Food Photos, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/8/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Radcliffe, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Clerk's Default,
Att: 4 Unanswered Pleading (Complaint)
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
14 14 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Tue 04/25 4:32 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to L & J Meats, LLC d/b/a Manning's Meat (yl)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
13 13 motion Clerk to Enter Default Mon 04/24 6:23 AM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant L & J Meats, LLC filed by Plaintiff Prepared Food Photos, Inc.. (Radcliffe, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Clerk Default
Monday, April 17, 2023
12 12 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 04/17 1:15 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court hereby orders plaintiff (s) to show cause in writing no later than APRIL 26, 2023 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. It is the responsibility of plaintiff to respond promptly to all Orders and to prosecute the action diligently, including filing proofs of service and stipulations extending time to respond. If necessary, plaintiff(s) must also pursue Rule 55 remedies promptly upon default of any defendant. All stipulations affecting the progress of the case must be approved by the Court, Local Rule 7-1. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff(s), the Court will accept one of the following as an appropriate response to this OSC if it is filed on or before the above date, as evidence that the matter is being prosecuted diligently: Defendant's Answer to Complaint OR Plaintiffs Request for Entry of Default. No oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiff(s) is due. Plaintiff counsel is ordered to serve this document on defendant(s) within 24 hours after entry on the docket. (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 04/11 8:57 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Prepared Food Photos, Inc., upon Defendant L & J Meats, LLC served on 3/23/2023, answer due 4/13/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Heather Manning, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Radcliffe, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
10 10 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 03/27 5:02 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: This matter has been assigned to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's website under Judge Frimpong's Procedures and Schedules. Please read the Standing Order carefully. It is the responsibilities of the parties to maintain familiarly with the Standing Order and any future amendments that the Court may issue by periodically checking the Courts website for the operative version of the Standing Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 03/14 5:08 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant L & J Meats, LLC. (jtil)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 03/14 4:12 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 03/14 4:12 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 03/14 4:11 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
5 5 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Mon 03/13 8:55 AM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Prepared Food Photos, Inc.. (Radcliffe, Scott)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 03/13 8:54 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Prepared Food Photos, Inc., (Radcliffe, Scott)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Mon 03/13 8:53 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Prepared Food Photos, Inc.. (Radcliffe, Scott)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 03/13 8:51 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Prepared Food Photos, Inc.. (Radcliffe, Scott)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/13 8:50 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34940765 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Prepared Food Photos, Inc.. (Attorney Scott Edward Radcliffe added to party Prepared Food Photos, Inc.(pty:pla))(Radcliffe, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B