Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:21-bk-00189

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Pamela W Mcafee
Case #: 5:23-ap-00017
Nature of Suit31 Bankruptcy - Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - §363(h)
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2023
Terminated:Jul 16, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Howard Beeman Herbert, Jr.
6323 Abercarn Way
Fayetteville, NC 28311
Represented By
Howard Beeman Herbert, Jr.
contact info
Defendant
Dunbar & Bentley LLC
121 Shrine Club Ln.
Clinton, NC 28328
Represented By
Dunbar & Bentley LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard D Sparkman, Trustee
Richard D. Sparkman, P.A. PO Box 1687
Angier, NC 27501
Represented By
George F. Sanderson, III
The Sanderson Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Tue 07/16 2:47 PM
Adversary Case 5:23-ap-17 Closed (Donnery, Erin)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
43 43 3 pgs notice Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 07/15 2:43 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal filed by William H. Kroll, George F. Sanderson III on behalf of Howard Beeman Herbert Jr., Richard D Sparkman, Trustee. (Sanderson, George)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Motion (Public) Mon 07/15 10:34 AM
Motion Terminated. Withdrawn Related [+] (Donnery, Erin)
Related: [-] 32 Motion to Approve/Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff Richard D Sparkman, Trustee
Friday, July 12, 2024
42 42 misc Withdrawal of Document Fri 07/12 2:22 PM
Withdrawal of Document filed by George F. Sanderson III on behalf of Richard D Sparkman, Trustee Related [+]. (Sanderson, George)
Related: [-] 32 Motion to Approve/Enforce Settlement Agreement - Against Howard Beeman Herbert, Jr.
Monday, June 17, 2024
utility Matter Removed from Calendar Mon 06/17 12:53 PM
Matter Removed from Calendar Prior to Hearing Consent Order Attorney for Plaintiff to submit Related [+] (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] 32 Motion to Approve/Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff Richard D Sparkman, Trustee
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
41 41 court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled (Motion) Tue 05/14 3:43 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 6/20/2024 at 10:00 AM at Raleigh Courtroom (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] 32 Motion to Approve/Enforce Settlement Agreement - Against Howard Beeman Herbert, Jr. filed by George F. Sanderson III on behalf of Trustee.
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
40 40 court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled (Motion) Wed 03/20 3:34 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2024 at 11:00 AM at Raleigh Courtroom (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] 32 Motion to Approve/Enforce Settlement Agreement - Against Howard Beeman Herbert, Jr. filed by George F. Sanderson III on behalf of Plainitiff Richard D Sparkman
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
39 39 order Continuance of Hearing Tue 03/19 4:25 PM
Order Granting Motion to Continue Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2024 at 10:00 AM at Raleigh Courtroom (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] 38 32 Motion to Approve/Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff Richard D Sparkman, Trustee
38 38 motion Continue Hearing Tue 03/19 2:06 PM
Motion to Continue Hearing Related [+] filed by William H. Kroll on behalf of Howard Beeman Herbert Jr.. (Kroll, William)
Related: [-] ument no. Notice of Hearing (related document(s):32 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement - Against Howard Beeman Herbert, Jr. filed by George F. Sanderson III on behalf of Plaintiff Richard D Sparkman, Trustee) Hearing scheduled for 3/6/2024 at 02:00 PM at Raleigh Courtroomument no.35 Notice of Hearing
utility Matter Removed from Calendar Tue 03/19 1:37 PM
Matter Removed from Calendar Prior to Hearing Continued Prior to Court Related [+] (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] 32 Motion to Approve/Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff Richard D Sparkman, Trustee
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
37 37 audio Wed 03/06 4:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [03/06/2024 02:32:59 PM]. File Size [ 1135 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:25 ]. (Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement). (admin)
Related: [-]
36 36 audio Wed 03/06 4:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [03/06/2024 02:02:44 PM]. File Size [ 6879 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:14:40 ]. (Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement). (admin)
Related: [-]
court Court Minutes Wed 03/06 2:40 PM
Court Minutes - Hearing Rescheduled. Hearing Judge: PWM Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 3/20/2024 at 01:30 PM at Raleigh Courtroom (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] 32 Motion to Approve/Enforce Settlement Agreement
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
35 35 court Hearing Set (Motion) Wed 02/28 12:45 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 3/6/2024 at 02:00 PM at Raleigh Courtroom (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] 32 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement - Against Howard Beeman Herbert, Jr. filed by George F. Sanderson III on behalf of Plaintiff Richard D Sparkman, Trustee
34 34 utility Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Wed 02/28 12:42 PM
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Related [+] (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] ument no.32 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff Richard D Sparkman, Trustee
Thursday, February 22, 2024
33 33 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP) Thu 02/22 3:36 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to George F. Sanderson. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: The order uploaded is improperly formatted. The top margin does not measure 3". Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Related [+] Due by 3/4/2024. (Felder-Campbell, Jade)
Related: [-] ument no.32 Motion to Approve/Enforce Settlement Agreement - Against Howard Beeman Herbert, Jr. filed by Richard D Sparkman, Trustee
Monday, January 29, 2024
32 32 motion Settlement Agreement Mon 01/29 6:15 PM
Motion to Approve/Enforce Settlement Agreement - Against Howard Beeman Herbert, Jr. filed by George F. Sanderson III on behalf of Richard D Sparkman, Trustee. (Sanderson, George)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
31 31 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Sat 10/07 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 10/06/2023. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
30 30 order Default Judgment Wed 10/04 1:10 PM
Order Granting Motion. Default Judgment as to Dunbar & Bentley LLC Related [+] (Donnery, Erin)
Related: [-] 14
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
29 29 6 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 10/03 12:50 PM
Consent Order on Motion for Relief from Stay. (Donnery, Erin)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Compromise Tue 10/03 12:48 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Related [+], Granting Motion to Approve Consent Order (Donnery, Erin)
Related: [-] 26 26
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
27 27 misc Certificate of Service (Not for Summons) Tue 09/05 6:14 PM
Certificate of Service filed by George F. Sanderson III on behalf of Richard D Sparkman, Trustee Related [+]. (Sanderson, George)
Related: [-] 26 Motion to Approve Compromise With Howard Beeman Herbert, Jr., Motion to Approve Consent Order - resolving Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay
26 26 motion Approve Consent Order Tue 09/05 2:26 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise With Howard Beeman Herbert, Jr., In Addition To Motion to Approve Consent Order - resolving Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay filed by George F. Sanderson III on behalf of Richard D Sparkman, Trustee. (Sanderson, George)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
25 25 admis Report of Mediator/Examiner Mon 08/28 3:15 PM
Report of Mediator filed by Jason L. Hendren (Hendren, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
24 24 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Thu 08/03 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 08/02/2023. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23
Monday, July 31, 2023
23 23 order Directing Filing of Joint Report Mon 07/31 4:17 PM
Order Directing Parties to File Joint Report Pre-Conference Report due by 8/30/2023. (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
22 22 11 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 07/14 4:17 PM
Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Related [+]. (Donnery, Erin)
Related: [-] 13 Answer to Complaint, Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Howard Beeman Herbert
Friday, June 09, 2023
utility Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Fri 06/09 9:43 AM
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar 6/15/2023 Related [+] (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] ument no.21 Memorandum of Law filed by Plaintiff Richard D Sparkman, Trustee
Thursday, June 08, 2023
21 21 6 pgs misc Memorandum of Law Thu 06/08 2:41 PM
Memorandum of Law in response to Defendant Herbert's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by George F. Sanderson III on behalf of Richard D Sparkman, Trustee Related [+]. (Sanderson, George)
Related: [-] 17 Memorandum of Law
Friday, June 02, 2023
20 20 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Hearing Sat 06/03 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Hearing Notice Date 06/02/2023. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
19 19 court Hearing Set (Other) Wed 05/31 3:02 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 6/15/2023 at 11:00 AM at Raleigh Courtroom (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Howard Beeman Herbert
18 18 utility Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Wed 05/31 2:58 PM
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Related [+] (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] ument no.1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard D Sparkman, Trustee,13 Answer to Complaint and Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Howard Beeman Herbert,16 Memorandum of Law filed by Plaintiff Richard D Sparkman, Trustee,17 Memorandum of Law filed by Defendant Howard Beeman Herbert
17 17 24 pgs misc Memorandum of Law Wed 05/31 1:48 PM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by William H. Kroll on behalf of Howard Beeman Herbert Jr. Related [+]. (Kroll, William)
Related: [-] 13 Answer to Complaint
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
16 16 10 pgs misc Memorandum of Law Tue 05/30 3:59 PM
Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Contained in Answer filed by George F. Sanderson III on behalf of Richard D Sparkman, Trustee Related [+]. (Sanderson, George)
Related: [-] 13 Answer to Complaint
Monday, May 15, 2023
15 15 7 pgs misc Memorandum of Law Mon 05/15 11:37 AM
Memorandum of Law filed by George F. Sanderson III on behalf of Richard D Sparkman, Trustee Related [+]. (Sanderson, George)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Default Judgment as to Dunbar & Bentley LLC
14 14 motion Default Judgment Mon 05/15 11:36 AM
Motion for Default Judgment as to Dunbar & Bentley LLC filed by George F. Sanderson III on behalf of Richard D Sparkman, Trustee. (Sanderson, George)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/09 8:07 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by William H. Kroll on behalf of Howard Beeman Herbert Jr.. (Kroll, William)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 23, 2023
12 12 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Mon 04/24 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 04/23/2023. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11
Friday, April 21, 2023
11 11 court Entry of Default Fri 04/21 11:54 AM
Entry of Default Related [+] (Wright, Dawn)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Richard D Sparkman, Trustee
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
10 10 motion Entry of Default Wed 04/19 3:27 PM
Motion for Entry of Default as to Dunbar & Bentley LLC filed by George F. Sanderson III on behalf of Richard D Sparkman, Trustee. (Sanderson, George)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 15, 2023
9 9 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Sun 04/16 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 04/15/2023. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, April 14, 2023
8 8 order Extend Time Fri 04/14 10:29 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Howard Beeman Herbert, Jr. Answer due by 5/10/2023. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] 5
Thursday, April 13, 2023
7 7 order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed Thu 04/13 9:06 AM
Order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed After Dunbar & Bentley, LLC's Failure to Answer Due by 5/5/2023. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadline (Public) Thu 04/13 12:52 PM
Deadline(s) Terminated. Proposed Order Received. Related [+] (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] ument no. 6 Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP)
Thursday, April 06, 2023
6 6 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP) Thu 04/06 8:01 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to William Kroll. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: An order granting the relief requested was not submitted as required by Local Rule 5005-4(4). Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Related [+] Due by 4/17/2023. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] ument no.5 Motion to Extend Time to File Answer, filed by Howard Beeman Herbert
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
5 5 motion Extend Time/Deadlines Wed 04/05 12:22 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer, filed by William H. Kroll on behalf of Howard Beeman Herbert Jr. Related [+]. (Kroll, William)
Related: [-] ument no.1 Complaint
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance Wed 04/05 11:28 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by William H. Kroll on behalf of Howard Beeman Herbert Jr.. (Kroll, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 03/16 4:48 PM
Summons Service Executed on Dunbar & Bentley LLC 3/16/2023; Howard Beeman Herbert, Jr. 3/16/2023. filed by George F. Sanderson III on behalf of Richard D Sparkman, Trustee. (Sanderson, George)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 03/10 3:56 PM
Summons Issued on Howard Beeman Herbert, Jr. Answer Due 04/10/2023; Dunbar & Bentley LLC Answer Due 04/10/2023 (Sanderson, George)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/10 3:56 PM
Adversary case 23-00017 5. Complaint by Richard D Sparkman, Trustee against Howard Beeman Herbert, Jr., Dunbar & Bentley LLC (Fee Paid) (31 (Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - 363(h))) (Sanderson, George)
Related: [-]