California Central District Court
Judge:Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 5:23-cv-00427
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2023
Terminated:Aug 09, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
27 27 order Awarding EAJA Fees Wed 10/04 10:07 AM
ORDER AWARDING EAJA FEES by Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. IT IS ORDERED that fees and expenses in the amount of $5,900.00 as authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 2412, and costs in the amount of $402.00 as authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 1920, be awarded subject to the terms of the Stipulation,26 . (es)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
26 26 stip Award of EAJA Fees Tue 10/03 2:14 PM
STIPULATION FOR AWARD of EAJA Fees in the amount of $5900. and costs in the amount of $402.00 as authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 1920, be awarded subject to the terms of the Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Mary Williams.(Krank, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
25 25 judgmentCV Judgment Thu 08/10 8:12 AM
JUDGMENT OF REMAND by Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff, Related to: Stipulation to Remand Case to US Agency23 , Order to Remand Case to US Agency24 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the above-captioned action is remanded to the Commissioner of Social Security for further proceedings consistent with the Stipulation to Remand. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (es)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Remand Case to US Agency Thu 08/10 8:09 AM
ORDER OF REMAND by Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff, IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned action be remanded to the Commissioner of Social Security for further proceedings consistent with the terms of the Stipulation to Remand. (es)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
23 23 stip Remand Case to US Agency Mon 08/07 1:25 PM
STIPULATION to Remand Case to US Agency filed by defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Tsai, Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, July 31, 2023
22 22 2 pgs order Order Mon 07/31 10:08 AM
ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File21 IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall have until September 8, 2023 to file her responsive brief, with all other deadlines extended accordingly. (es)
Related: [-]
21 21 stip Extension of Time to File Document Mon 07/31 8:48 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File responsive brief filed by defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Tsai, Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 07/26 2:17 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Geralyn A Gulseth counsel for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Geralyn Gulseth is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Gulseth, Geralyn)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 07/26 2:04 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mary C Tsai counsel for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Adding Mary Tsai as counsel of record for Commissioner of Social Security for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attorney Mary C Tsai added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Tsai, Mary)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
18 18 motion Summary Judgment Mon 07/10 3:41 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Mary Williams. (Krank, Laura)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order Wed 07/05 11:27 AM
ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File16 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that Plaintiff shall have an extension of time, to and include July 10, 2023, in which to file Plaintiffs Opening Brief; and that all other deadlines set forth in the March 13, 2023 Case Management Order shall be extended accordingly. (et)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 03, 2023
16 16 stip Extension of Time to File Document Mon 07/03 4:04 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File filed by Plaintiff Mary Williams.(Krank, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement
Friday, June 02, 2023
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 06/02 9:04 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 AS LIMITED TO THE ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE OF THE CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OF MARY WILLIAMS (mj), PURSUANT TO SUPPLEMENTAL FEDERAL RULES FOR SOCIAL SECURITY REVIEW ACTIONS UNDER 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), RULE 4(b) filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Gulseth, Geralyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Page,
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index,
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable,
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions,
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices Part 1,
Att: 6 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices Part 2,
Att: 7 Non Disability Related Development,
Att: 8 Disability Related Development,
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 1,
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 2,
Att: 11 Medical Records Part 3,
Att: 12 Medical Records Part 4,
Att: 13 Medical Records Part 5
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
14 14 misc Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only) Tue 05/30 12:34 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Gulseth, Geralyn)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
13 13 2 pgs order Order Mon 05/15 10:27 AM
ORDER TO EXTEND THE DATE FOR DEFENDANT'S SERVICE OF THE CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. Based upon Defendant's Motion, IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall be granted a second extension and shall have until June 2, 2023 to file and serve the Certified Administrative Record in this case. re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)12 (ch)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
12 12 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Fri 05/12 5:29 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Kilolo Kijakazi answer now due 6/2/2023, filed by defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Gulseth, Geralyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
11 11 misc Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA) Tue 04/25 4:43 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Mary Williams. (Krank, Laura)
Related: [-]
10 10 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 04/25 3:18 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (In Chambers) by Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. This case has been reassigned to the Honorable Brianna Fuller Mircheff, United States Magistrate Judge, pursuant to the Order of the Chief Magistrate Judge regarding the transfer of cases filed 4/21/2023. Please substitute the initials of the former magistrate judge assigned to this case with the initials BFM. The case number will now read: ED CV 23-00427 BFM. It is important to use the correct initials on all subsequent filings because documents are routed using the Judge's initials. Magistrate Judge Mircheff's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Christianna Howard, may be reached at christianna_howard@cacd.uscourts.gov. Magistrate Judge Mircheff's courtroom is located on the 7th floor of the Roybal Federal Building and United States Courthouse at 255 E. Temple Street, Courtroom 780. All orders previously issued remain in effect. The parties consented to proceed with the previous Magistrate Judge. That consent has been vacated by the Order of the Chief Magistrate Judge. If the parties wish to proceed before Judge Mircheff, they shall file a new consent form. If such form is not filed within 30 days from the date of the Order of the Chief Magistrate Judge transferring this case, the case will be reassigned to the originally assigned District Judge and the newly assigned Magistrate Judge will remain as the referral judge. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ch)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
9 9 cs_rasgn Chief Magistrate Judge Transferring Social Security Consent Case Fri 04/21 11:40 AM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE - OCMJ# 23-027 by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Magistrate Judge Brianna F. Mircheff, this case is transferred from the calendar of Magistrate Judge Steve Kim to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff for all further proceedings. All documents subsequently filed shall bear this new case designation 5:23-cv-00427 BFM absent further order of the Court. (rn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
8 8 notice Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge Thu 04/06 9:13 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV23-427 SK on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
7 7 misc Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only) Wed 04/05 11:12 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Geralyn A Gulseth added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Gulseth, Geralyn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
6 6 misc Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA) Tue 03/14 10:34 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Mary Williams. (Krank, Laura)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
5 5 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 03/13 4:12 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (see document for details) (hr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Blank Consent Form
4 4 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Mon 03/13 1:32 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 03/13 10:24 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mary Williams, (Krank, Laura)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 03/13 10:23 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mary Williams. (Krank, Laura)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/13 10:21 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34942048 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Mary Williams. (Attorney Laura E. Krank added to party Mary Williams(pty:pla))(Krank, Laura)
Related: [-]