Nevada District Court
Judge:Cam Ferenbach
Case #: 2:23-cv-00386
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2023
Terminated:Jun 13, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, July 07, 2023
18 18 6 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 07/10 12:50 PM
ORDER Granting17 Stipulation for Allowance of Fees Under the Equal Acess to Justice Act. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall be awarded attorney fees in the amount of $1,300.00 (three-thousand three-hundred dollars and zero cents). Such award is made in full and final satisfaction (upon payment) of any and all claims under the EAJA for fees, expenses, and costs. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/7/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
17 17 motion Stipulation Mon 06/26 1:03 PM
STIPULATION For Allowance of Fees Under EAJA by Plaintiff Timothy Calabrese.(Dunn, Jennifer) (other) (attyfees)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Statement of Time,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 06/13 4:16 PM
ORDER Granting14 Stipulation to Remand for further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/13/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Stipulation Tue 06/13 12:54 PM
STIPULATION TO REMAND for further proceedings by Defendant SSA-Office of the General Counsel. (Edwards, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
13 13 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Mon 05/15 11:56 AM
ORDER Granting12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time File Certified Administration Record and Answer. Responses due by 6/15/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/12/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Fri 05/12 2:18 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re5 Complaint by Defendant SSA-Office of the General Counsel. Responses due by 5/26/2023. (Edwards, L.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
11 11 misc Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in SS Case Thu 05/11 6:55 AM
NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (Dunn, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
10 10 notice Notice Assignment of Case to MJ & Consent Form in SS Case Wed 05/10 1:02 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE pursuant to General Order 2019-08: This case has been randomly assigned to a Magistrate Judge pending the parties' consent or declination. Pursuant to 28 USC § 636(c), with written consent of all parties, a Magistrate Judge may conduct all proceedings in a case, including all pretrial and trial proceedings, entry of judgment, and post-trial motions. Any appeals will be made directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. The form to indicate whether you consent or decline is attached. Consent or declination is due by 5/17/2023. Please file the completed form under the filing event Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in the Social Security Case civil menu category. (AF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
9 9 notice Notice Appearance of Counsel Tue 03/21 8:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney L. Jamala Edwards on behalf of Defendant Commissioner Of Social Security. (Edwards, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
8 8 8 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/17 3:58 PM
ORDER Granting7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jennifer L. Dunn for Timothy Calabrese and approving Designation of Local Counsel Hal Taylor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/17/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
7 7 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Thu 03/16 3:39 PM
First MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer L. Dunn and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Hal Taylor (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7238366) by Plaintiff Timothy Calabrese. (Taylor, Hal)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 03/16 3:27 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Timothy Calabrese. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Complaint Thu 03/16 11:09 AM
COMPLAINT against SSA-Office of the General Counsel, Commissioner Of Social Security by Timothy Calabrese. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/26/2023. Proof of service due by 6/14/2023. (JQC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
4 4 2 pgs order Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 03/16 10:59 AM
ORDER Granting1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that1 -1,1 -2 Plaintiff's Complaint will proceed against Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/16/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
3 3 misc Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in SS Case Wed 03/15 10:02 AM
NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (JQC) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/15/2023) (JQC)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Wed 03/15 10:01 AM
Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JQC)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Mon 03/13 11:02 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Timothy Calabrese. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 03/13 11:00 AM
First MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Timothy Calabrese.(Taylor, Hal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet CCS