Guri Gonzalez v. 7257 Melrose, LLC
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01851 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 06, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 2:52 AM PDT |
Defendant
7257 Melrose, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Plaintiff
Guri Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Thu 07/06 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Guri Gonzalez. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 06/14 2:02 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT by Judge George H. Wu. On June 13, 2023, Plaintiff Guri Gonzalez filed a Notice of Settlement. The Court hereby vacates all currently set dates, with the expectation that a dismissal will be filed within 60 days. The Court now sets an order to show re: settlement hearing for July 17, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. The hearing will be vacated provided a stipulation to dismiss is filed by noon on July 14, 2023. (aco) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Settlement
Tue 06/13 5:26 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Guri Gonzalez. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Wed 05/10 10:13 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for June 22, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than June 15, 2023. See Local Rule 26-1. (aco) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Wed 05/10 9:39 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 05/09 4:06 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant 7257 Melrose, LLC.(Attorney Richard T Miller added to party 7257 Melrose, LLC(pty:dft))(Miller, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
10
pgs
order
Order
Wed 03/15 3:19 PM
STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU: 1. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (see document for further details) (bm) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 12:22 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant 7257 Melrose, LLC. (jtil) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Wed 03/15 10:24 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 10:24 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 10:23 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/13 11:41 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Guri Gonzalez. (Kim, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/13 11:33 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/13 11:32 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Guri Gonzalez. (Kim, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 11:31 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34943068 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Guri Gonzalez(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) |