Bridgette Darlene Leal v. Kilolo Kijakazi
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John F Walter |
Referred: | Brianna Fuller Mircheff |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00448 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 11, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 30, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
order
Awarding EAJA Fees
Wed 08/30 1:37 PM
ORDER AWARDING EAJA FEES by Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall be awarded attorney fees under the EAJA in the amount of FIVE THOUSAND TWO HUNDRED NINTEY TWO AND SIXTY CENTS ($5,292.60), and costs under 28 U.S.C. § 1920, in the amount of FOUR HUNDRED AND TWO DOLLARS ($402.00), subject to the terms of the above-referenced Stipulation. Re: Stipulation for Attorney Fees19 . (es) |
|
19 | 19
stip
Attorney Fees
Wed 08/30 12:50 PM
STIPULATION for Attorney Fees Bridgette Darlene Leal.(Yim, Young) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Friday, August 11, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
judgmentCV
Judgment
Fri 08/11 9:47 AM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff, Related to: Order to Remand Case to US Agency,17 , Stipulation to Remand Case to US Agency16 Having approved the parties' joint stipulation to voluntary remand pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) and to entry of judgment, THE COURT ADJUDGES AND DECREES that judgment is entered for Plaintiff. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (es) |
|
17 | 17
order
Remand Case to US Agency
Fri 08/11 9:44 AM
ORDER TO REMAND PURSUANT TO SENTENCE FOUR OF 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. THE COURT ORDERS that this case be remanded to the Social Security Administration for further proceedings, consistent with the parties' joint stipulation, and that judgment be entered for Plaintiff. (es) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
stip
Remand Case to US Agency
Thu 08/10 10:29 AM
STIPULATION to Remand Case to US Agency filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Vieira, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Judgment | ||
Wednesday, August 02, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 08/02 8:23 AM
ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. Based upon the parties' Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule, IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall have until August 25, 2023, to file her Responsive Brief. re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File14 (ch) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 08/01 12:09 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response Brief filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Vieira, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 29, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 06/29 9:50 AM
ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff, Based upon the parties' Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule12 , IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall have until August 4, 2023, to file her Responsive Brief. (es) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 06/28 1:34 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response Brief filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Vieira, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Wed 06/21 9:52 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher D Vieira counsel for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Adding Christopher Vieira as counsel of record for Commissioner of Social Security for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attorney Christopher D Vieira added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Vieira, Christopher) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Wed 06/21 8:10 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael K Marriott counsel for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Michael Marriott is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Marriott, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Wed 06/07 11:14 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Plaintiff Bridgette Darlene Leal. (Yim, Young) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 05/12 9:13 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 AS LIMITED TO THE ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE OF THE CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, PURSUANT TO SUPPLEMENTAL FEDERAL RULES FOR SOCIAL SECURITY REVIEW ACTIONS UNDER 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), RULE 4(b) (cu) filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Marriott, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable Part 1, | ||
Att: 4 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable Part 2, | ||
Att: 5 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable Part 3, | ||
Att: 6 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 7 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 8 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 9 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records | ||
Friday, April 21, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
cs_rasgn
Chief Magistrate Judge Transferring Case (non-consent)
Fri 04/21 1:59 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE - OCMJ# 23-031 by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Magistrate Judge Brianna F. Mircheff, this case is transferred from the calendar of Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff for all further proceedings. All documents subsequently filed shall bear this new case designation 8:23-cv-00448 JFW(BFM) absent further order of the Court. (rn) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Thu 04/06 8:22 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Michael K Marriott added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Marriott, Michael) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Mon 03/13 5:15 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/13 11:36 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Yim, Young) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/13 11:35 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 Bridgette Darlene Leal. (Yim, Young) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/13 11:34 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Bridgette Darlene Leal. (Yim, Young) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 11:33 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34943070 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Young Bin Yim added to party Bridgette Darlene Leal(pty:pla))(Yim, Young) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H |