Paden El Bey: Tiffany v. Cannon A. Douglas et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew P Gordon |
Referred: | Elayna J Youchah |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00388 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 12, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 2:10 AM PDT |
Defendant
Harlow R. Colin
|
|
Defendant
Cannon A. Douglas
|
|
Defendant
Scott M. Lisa
|
|
Defendant
NV Energy Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Paden El Bey: Tiffany
630 Rubber Tree Ave.
N. Las Vegas, NV 89032 |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendation Order Dismissing Case
Mon 06/12 6:21 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Youchah's report and recommendation (ECF No. 5 ) is accepted , and the plaintiff's complaint (ECF No. [1-2]) is dismissed without prejudice . Case is closed. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/10/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Report and Recommendation
Tue 05/09 2:08 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that this matter be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's 3/16/2023 Order. Objections to R&R due by 5/23/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/9/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice Other
Mon 03/20 2:39 PM
Billing Error Notice by Paden El Bey: Tiffany. (HAM) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings (non motion deadlines)
Thu 03/16 4:40 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff has one opportunity to file a complete long form IFP application. The application must be filed no later than April 7, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/16/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - IFP long form/instructions mailed to P - HAM) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas
Mon 03/13 4:20 PM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (YAW) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/13 4:13 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Paden El Bey: Tiffany.(YAW) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Mon 03/13 1:28 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (HAM) |