Paden El Bey: Tiffany v. Cox Communication et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Cristina D Silva |
Referred: | Nancy J Koppe |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00391 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 12, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 3:02 AM PDT |
Defendant
Stephanie Barraza
|
|
Defendant
Cox Communication
|
|
Defendant
Thomas Tadlock
|
|
Defendant
Alexander Taylor
|
|
Plaintiff
Paden El Bey: Tiffany
630 Rubber Tree Ave.
N. Las Vegas, NV 89032 |
Docket last updated: 21 minutes ago |
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judgment
Tue 06/13 12:59 PM
JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants Cox Communication, Alexander Taylor, Stephanie Barraza, Thomas Tadlock, and against Plaintiff Paden El Bey: Tiffany. This case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 6/12/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendation Order Dismissing Case
Tue 06/13 12:49 PM
ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendations. This case is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 6/12/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Report and Recommendation
Tue 05/23 11:03 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The undersigned Recommends that this case be Dismissed without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 6/6/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/23/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 03/22 11:10 AM
ORDER. The Clerk's office is instructed to Strike the filing at 4 and return the documents to Plaintiff forthwith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/22/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Exhibit
Tue 03/21 9:25 AM
EXHIBIT to1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Paden El Bey: Tiffany.. (JQC) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order Show Cause
Tue 03/14 2:44 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 4/21/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas
Mon 03/13 4:34 PM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JQC) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/13 4:30 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Paden El Bey: Tiffany.(JQC) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Mon 03/13 1:42 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (HAM) |