Paden El Bey: Tiffany v. Hochschild et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Gloria M Navarro |
Referred: | Nancy J Koppe |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00392 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | Sep 07, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 1:53 AM PDT |
Defendant
Discover Financial Services
|
|
Defendant
Chavez David
|
|
Defendant
Hochschild Roger C
|
|
Plaintiff
Paden El Bey: Tiffany
630 Rubber Tree Ave.
N. Las Vegas, NV 89032 |
Docket last updated: 83 minutes ago |
Thursday, September 07, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendation Order Dismissing Case
Fri 09/08 10:45 AM
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the14 Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/7/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Report and Recommendation
Fri 08/18 11:52 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS RECOMMENDED that this case be Dismissed without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 9/1/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/18/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
misc
QC Notice
Wed 06/14 12:04 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Paden El Bey: Tiffany. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/21/2023. (no image attached) (HAM) |
||
Monday, June 05, 2023 | ||
misc
QC Notice
Mon 06/05 10:02 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Paden El Bey: Tiffany. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/12/2023. (no image attached) (HAM) |
||
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
Complaint
Thu 05/25 1:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Chavez David, Discover Financial Services, Hochschild Roger C by Paden El Bey: Tiffany. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/4/2023. Proof of service due by 8/23/2023. (ALZ) (Main Document 11 replaced on 5/25/2023) (ALZ) |
|
10 | 10
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 05/25 12:57 PM
ORDER Granting1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk's Office is INTRUSTED to merge Docket Nos. (1-1) and9 and file the document as Plaintiff's Complaint. The Complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Amended Complaint deadline: 6/19/2023. Failure to comply with this order will result in recommended dismissal of the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/25/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice Other
Thu 04/20 9:50 AM
NOTICE of Cause of Action by Paden El Bey: Tiffany. (JQC) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Response Order to Show Cause
Thu 04/20 9:23 AM
RESPONSE to5 Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Paden El Bey: Tiffany. (KF) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/21 11:53 AM
ORDER that the Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to strike the filing at Docket No. 6 and return the documents to Plaintiff forthwith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/21/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice Other
Mon 03/20 3:11 PM
BILLING ERROR NOTICE by Paden El Bey: Tiffany. (TRW) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Show Cause
Wed 03/15 9:59 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 4/21/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/15/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) |
|
notice
Clerks Notice Reassign Judge
Wed 03/15 7:25 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:23-cv-00392-GMN-NJK . (no image attached) (DRS) |
||
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order Recusal
Tue 03/14 3:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/14/2023. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL) |
||
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas
Mon 03/13 2:18 PM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (TRW) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/13 2:17 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Paden El Bey: Tiffany.(TRW) |
|
Att: 1 5 pgs Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Mon 03/13 1:46 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (HAM) |