Nevada District Court
Judge:Jennifer A Dorsey
Referred: Nancy J Koppe
Case #: 2:23-cv-00394
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2023
Terminated:Jun 08, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 3:51 AM PDT
Defendant
Synchrony
Defendant
Doubles: Brian D
Plaintiff
Paden El Bey: Tiffany
630 Rubber Tree Ave.
N. Las Vegas, NV 89032


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, June 08, 2023
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendation Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis ~Util - Terminate Case Thu 06/08 12:24 PM
ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendations re6 Report and Recommendation and this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that1 the application to proceed in forma is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/8/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
6 6 motion Report and Recommendation Tue 05/23 11:05 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The undersigned Recommends that this case be Dismissed without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 6/6/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/23/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order Tue 03/21 1:19 PM
ORDER re 4 Billing error. The Clerk's office is instructed to strike the filing at docket no. 4 and return the documents to plaintiff forthwith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/21/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
4 4 notice Notice Other Mon 03/20 2:43 PM
Billing error Notice by Paden El Bey: Tiffany. (LOE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
3 3 4 pgs notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Tue 03/14 3:34 PM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (LOE)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs order Order Tue 03/14 1:50 PM
ORDER re1 Application to proceed in forma pauperis . Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause in writing, by April 21, 2023, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
1 1 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 03/13 2:39 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Paden El Bey: Tiffany.(LOE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Complaint,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Mon 03/13 1:54 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (HAM)
Related: [-]