Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Timothy J Savage
Case #: 2:23-cv-00970
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2023
Terminated:Jun 23, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 5:05 AM EDT
Defendant
NUCO PAINTING CORP
8 OvalDrive
Islandia, NY 11749
Represented By
ALISON P. WASSERMAN
Goetz Schenker Blee & Weiderhonrn, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GREENHILL SUPPLY, INC
PO Box 46926
Philadelphia, PA 19160
Represented By
DANIEL C. LEVIN
Levin Sedran & Berman
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, June 23, 2023
misc Remark Fri 06/23 11:35 AM
DOC 7 MAILED TO COUNSEL (rf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Fri 06/23 8:39 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 6/22/23. 6/23/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
misc Remark Wed 05/17 7:49 AM
PAPER #6 MAILED TO COUNSEL (JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order Setting Answer Deadline Tue 05/16 2:48 PM
ORDER THAT NUCO PAINTING CORP SHALL RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT BY 6/16/23; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 5/16/23. 5/16/23 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
5 5 misc Stipulation Mon 05/15 8:44 AM
STIPULATION FOR INITIAL EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by GREENHILL SUPPLY, INC. (LEVIN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 03/27 1:01 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GREENHILL SUPPLY, INC. NUCO PAINTING CORP waiver sent on 3/14/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (LEVIN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 03/14 10:17 AM
Summons Issued as to NUCO PAINTING CORP. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 3/14/23 (JL)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/14 9:50 AM
NOTICE by GREENHILL SUPPLY, INC re1 Complaint (Attorney), Designation Form (LEVIN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
misc Attorney Required Forms Tue 03/14 9:09 AM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. The Related Case section is incomplete. The Yes/No questions need to be answered. (sbt)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Mon 03/13 4:31 PM
COMPLAINT against NUCO PAINTING CORP ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16557696.), filed by GREENHILL SUPPLY, INC.(LEVIN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Designation Form,
Att: 4 Case Management Track Form
misc Jury Demand Tue 03/14 10:15 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by GREENHILL SUPPLY, INC. (JL)
Related: [-]