August Image, LLC v. Baller Status LLC
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Wesley L Hsu |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01856 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 19, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 2:26 AM PDT |
Defendant
Baller Status LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
August Image, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 57 minutes ago |
Thursday, October 19, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Thu 10/19 3:48 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (lom) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal | ||
24 | 24
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Thu 10/19 7:06 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff August Image, LLC. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Radcliffe, Scott) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 09/18 10:55 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND SCHEDULING NOTICE AND (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (DKT. 21 ) by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: On 9/16/2023, Plaintiff filed Notice of Settlement (Dkt.22 ). The Court accepts the Notice of Settlement as a Response to the Order to Show Cause and sets an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for November 17, 2023 at 1:00 p.m. If the parties file a dismissal or response by 11/10/2023, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance by counsel will be required. All scheduled dates and deadlines are hereby VACATED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc) |
|
Saturday, September 16, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Settlement
Sat 09/16 5:02 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff August Image, LLC. (Radcliffe, Scott) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 09/11 12:35 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (DKT.19 ) by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: The Court issued an Order to Show Cause as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution (Dkt.19 ) (the "OSC"). Plaintiff was directed to file a response to the OSC no later than 9/8/2023. Upon review of the timely-filed Response (Dkt.20 ), the OSC is continued to 9/22/2023. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Response
Fri 09/08 10:17 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff August Image, LLCto Order to Show Cause,19 (Radcliffe, Scott) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 08/31 12:16 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff, to show cause in writing no later than September 8, 2023, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to defendant Baller Status LLC. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 07/19 10:12 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE WESLEY L. HSU. (hc) |
|
17 | 17
order
Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
Wed 07/19 8:52 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Baller Status LLC dba ballerstatus.com (lom) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Clerk to Enter Default
Tue 07/18 10:23 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Baller Status LLC filed by Plaintiff August Image, LLC. (Radcliffe, Scott) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 05/25 9:38 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff August Image, LLC, upon Defendant Baller Status LLC served on 5/24/2023, answer due 6/14/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Marco Valdez in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service (Radcliffe, Scott) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
cs_rasgn
Chief District Judge Transferring Case
Mon 05/22 11:14 AM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-059) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Wesley L. Hsu, this case is transferred from Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong to the calendar of Judge Wesley L. Hsu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-01856-WLH (Ex). (et) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Deficiency - Default /Default Judgment (CV-52b) - optional html form
Mon 04/17 4:58 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Baller Status LLC12 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Proof of Service is lacking required information. Time to respond has not expired. A notice of motion and hearing date/time is not required for the Clerk to enter default. The person served does not indicate they were served as an authorized agent for defendant. In addition, the proof of service should be mailed to the defendant as well and the proof of service does not indicate such. Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. (yl) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Clerk to Enter Default
Fri 04/14 8:53 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Baller Status LLC filed by Plaintiff August Image, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 5/25/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Radcliffe, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Exhibit "A" TO Motion | ||
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 03/29 6:29 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff August Image, LLC, upon Defendant Baller Status LLC served on 3/22/2023, answer due 4/12/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Judy, Registered Agent Marco Valdez's Wife in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Radcliffe, Scott) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 03/27 5:00 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: This matter has been assigned to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's website under Judge Frimpong's Procedures and Schedules. Please read the Standing Order carefully. It is the responsibilities of the parties to maintain familiarly with the Standing Order and any future amendments that the Court may issue by periodically checking the Courts website for the operative version of the Standing Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 2:46 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Baller Status LLC. (car) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/14 2:42 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 2:41 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 2:41 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Mon 03/13 2:14 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by August Image, LLC. (Radcliffe, Scott) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/13 2:13 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff August Image, LLC, (Radcliffe, Scott) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/13 2:10 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff August Image, LLC. (Radcliffe, Scott) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/13 2:09 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff August Image, LLC. (Radcliffe, Scott) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 2:08 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34944711 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff August Image, LLC. (Attorney Scott Edward Radcliffe added to party August Image, LLC(pty:pla))(Radcliffe, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E |