California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:23-cv-01863
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2023
Terminated:Jun 20, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 2:47 AM PDT
Defendant
Jerry L. Tyler
Represented By
Aasim Mustafa Ghaznavi
Mccready Law Group
contact info
Ashley Taylor Hylton
Mccready Law Group
contact info
Zach Cumer Skidelsky
Mccready Law Group
contact info
Zachary James McCready
Mccready Law Group
contact info
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Cassandra C Franklin
Represented By
Cassandra S. Franklin
Jams
contact info
Plaintiff
U.S. Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By
Carleton R Burch
Anderson Mcpharlin And Conners LLP
contact info
Christie M Bird
Frenkel Lambert Weiss Weisman And Gordon LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
37 37 stip Dismiss Case Tue 07/18 11:43 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Plaintiff U.S. Specialty Insurance Company.(Burch, Carleton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
36 36 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 06/20 2:16 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS ORDER MOVING CASE TO INACTIVE CALENDAR PENDING SETTLEMENT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court, having received the Mediation Report, filed June 19, 2023, vacates all previously set dates. The Court moves the matter to the inactive calendar pending finalization of settlement. The parties shall proceed with the settlement as outlined in the report. Should the settlement not be finalized within the designated time, the parties shall notify the Court, in writing, and request that the matter be restored to the active calendar. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2023
35 35 adr Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled Fri 06/16 3:17 PM
MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Cassandra C Franklin: Mediation held on June 16, 2023 and the case has been completely settled. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must notify the trial judge's deputy courtroom clerk of the fact of settlement and to promptly file documents regarding the final disposition of the case. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link:[LINK:MediationParticipantSurvey] (Franklin, Cassandra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
34 34 5 pgs stip Order Thu 06/15 5:33 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Order Requesting a Waiver of the Pretrial Procedures Under L.R. 16-2 Through L.R. 16-10 filed by Plaintiff U.S. Specialty Insurance Company.(Burch, Carleton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, June 12, 2023
33 33 respm Declaration (Motion related) Mon 06/12 4:41 PM
DECLARATION of Lisa Evon in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Conversion, Unjust Enrichment and/or Constructive Trust, Money Had and Received, Fraud, and Equitable Subrogation 31 filed by Plaintiff U.S. Specialty Insurance Company.(Burch, Carleton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Lisa Evon,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Lisa Evon,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Lisa Evon,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Lisa Evon,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Lisa Evon,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Lisa Evon,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Lisa Evon,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Lisa Evon,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Lisa Evon,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Lisa Evon
32 32 adr Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13) Mon 06/12 12:09 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for June 16, 2023.(Franklin, Cassandra)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2023
31 31 motion Summary Judgment Fri 06/09 3:39 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Conversion, Unjust Enrichment and/or Constructive Trust, Money Had and Received, Fraud, and Equitable Subrogation filed by Plaintiff U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 7/10/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Burch, Carleton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Lisa Evon,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Lisa Evon,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Lisa Evon,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Lisa Evon,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Lisa Evon,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Lisa Evon,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Lisa Evon,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Lisa Evon,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Lisa Evon,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Lisa Evon,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Lisa Evon,
Att: 12 Declaration of Jimmy Truong,
Att: 13 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law,
Att: 14 Proposed Judgment
Monday, June 05, 2023
30 30 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Mon 06/05 11:17 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Cassandra C Franklin has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
29 29 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Fri 06/02 3:19 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. (aco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
28 28 adr Request for ADR Procedure No. 2 - (ADR-1) Tue 05/30 3:17 PM
REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 2 filed. Parties request to appear before a neutral selected from the court's Mediation Panel for mediation. Filed by Plaintiff U.S. Specialty Insurance Company(Burch, Carleton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, May 26, 2023
27 27 3 pgs stip Order Fri 05/26 12:38 PM
STIPULATION for Order to Extend Mediation Deadline Under L.R. 16-15.2 filed by Plaintiff U.S. Specialty Insurance Company.(Burch, Carleton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
26 26 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2) Fri 05/26 12:33 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Cassandra Franklin may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. All parties and the Panel Mediator have agreed that the mediation will be held on 6/16/2023 and counsel will submit mediation statements seven (7) calendar days before the session. Filed by Plaintiff U.S. Specialty Insurance Company(Burch, Carleton)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
25 25 misc Disclosure Thu 05/04 2:47 PM
INITIAL DISCLOSURE Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Defendant Jerry L. Tyler (Skidelsky, Zach)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
24 24 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Thu 04/20 3:48 PM
CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
23 23 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 04/20 3:46 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The initial status conference scheduled for 04/24/2023 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. Jury trial is set for 07/25/2023 at 9:00 a.m., with a pretrial conference on 07/17/2023 at 3:00 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Thu 04/20 12:36 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 to 7 days, filed by Plaintiff U.S. Specialty Insurance Company.. (Burch, Carleton)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
21 21 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 04/19 2:51 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Initial Status Conference scheduled for 04/24/2023 at 3:00 p.m. has been rescheduled to 1:30 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
20 20 order For Order Fri 04/14 3:28 PM
ORDER GRANTING REMOTE APPEARANCE OF ATTORNEY CHRISTIE BIRD AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON APRIL 24, 2023 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. This court GRANTS this application. Ms. Bird will be allowed to participate remotely at the April 24, 2023 Case Management Conference.; granting19 REQUEST for Order for Remote Appearance. (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
19 19 3 pgs motion Order Thu 04/13 10:54 AM
REQUEST for Order for Remote Appearance Of Attorney Christie Bird At Case Management Conference On April 24, 2023 filed by Plaintiff U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. Request set for hearing on 4/24/2023 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Burch, Carleton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
18 18 3 pgs motion Order Wed 04/12 9:19 AM
REQUEST for Order for Remote Appearance Of Attorney Christie Bird At Case Management Conference On April 24, 2023 filed by Plaintiff U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. Request set for hearing on 4/24/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Burch, Carleton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 07, 2023
17 17 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/07 2:42 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. APPLICATION of Attorney Christie M. Bird to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, designating Carleton R. Burch as local counsel.; GRANTING16 Non-Resident Attorney Christie M. Bird. (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Thu 04/06 11:32 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christie M. Bird to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff U.S. Specialty Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35092868) filed by Plaintiff U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Burch, Carleton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 30, 2023
15 15 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Thu 03/30 3:37 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS ORDER re DEFICIENCY IN ATTORNEY'S BUSINESS OR CONTACT INFORMATION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The contact information for attorney Ashley T. Hylton is deficient in that no email address is listed on the Court's docket. If you are counsel of record in a case currently pending in this district and you need to update your business or contact information, you must file and serve Form G-06 ("Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information") in each of your pending cases. Doing so will satisfy your notice obligation under Local Rule 83-2.4. In addition, if you are a registered CM/ECF User, you must log in to your CM/ECF account and update your information directly in the CM/ECF System. See Local Rule 5-4.8.1. (aco)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 03/30 3:13 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 4/24/2023 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 03/30 9:56 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 03/29 12:30 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Jerry L. Tyler.(Attorney Zach Cumer Skidelsky added to party Jerry L. Tyler(pty:dft))(Skidelsky, Zach)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 03/16 2:07 PM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
10 10 service Summons Issued Wed 03/15 12:35 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Jerry L. Tyler. (iv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
9 9 notice Summons Request Tue 03/14 1:40 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Burch, Carleton)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Deficiency in Summons Tue 03/14 1:01 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request3 . The following error(s) was found: Please put the Central District of California on the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 03/14 12:42 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 03/14 12:42 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 03/14 12:41 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 03/13 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff U.S. Specialty Insurance Company a/s/o EagleRider Holdings, LLC, identifying U.S. Specialty Insurance Company is a wholly owned subsidiary of Houston Casualty Company. Houston Casualty Company is a wholly owned subsidiary of Illium, Inc. Illium, Inc. is a wholly owned subsidiary of HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Tokio Marine HCC. HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. is a wholly owned subsidiary of Tokio Marine & Nichodo Fire Insurance Co., Ltd., which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., a publicly traded company on the Tokyo Stock Exchange. (Burch, Carleton)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Mon 03/13 3:40 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff U.S. Specialty Insurance Company a/s/o EagleRider Holdings, LLC. (Burch, Carleton)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 03/13 3:32 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff U.S. Specialty Insurance Company a/s/o EagleRider Holdings, LLC. (Burch, Carleton)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/13 3:26 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34945943 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff U.S. Specialty Insurance Company a/s/o EagleRider Holdings, LLC. (Attorney Carleton R Burch added to party U.S. Specialty Insurance Company a/s/o EagleRider Holdings, LLC(pty:pla))(Burch, Carleton)
Related: [-]