California Central District Court
Judge:Andre Birotte Jr
Referred: Karen L Stevenson
Case #: 2:23-cv-01867
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2023
Terminated:Jun 09, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 2:54 AM PDT
Defendant
John Debney
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Joshua Cuevas
Represented By
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, June 09, 2023
15 15 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 06/09 3:30 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Joshua Cuevas. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
14 14 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Wed 05/10 11:27 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to John Debney, as Trustee of the John Debney Productions, Inc. Employees' Retirement Trust. (gk)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
13 13 motion Clerk to Enter Default Mon 05/08 4:41 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant John Debney filed by Plaintiff Joshua Cuevas. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 05/08 4:40 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Joshua Cuevas, upon Defendant John Debney served on 4/10/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Debney, as trustee of the John Debney Productions, Inc. Employees' Retirement trust, Defendant, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
11 11 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Tue 03/14 12:37 PM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (dbe)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 03/14 12:36 PM
Order re Prosecution of Certain Cases upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dbe)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 03/14 12:35 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dbe)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/13 5:37 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant John Debney. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 03/13 5:36 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 03/13 5:36 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 03/13 5:35 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Mon 03/13 4:02 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Joshua Cuevas. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 03/13 4:02 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 03/13 4:01 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Joshua Cuevas. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/13 4:00 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34946750 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Joshua Cuevas(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]