Nicko Casuga v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fred W Slaughter |
Referred: | Autumn D Spaeth |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00454 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 12, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 3:56 AM PDT |
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Nicko Casuga
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 09, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Wed 08/09 1:12 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Nicko Casuga. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Charity, Garrett) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 06/12 5:41 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court, having been notified by a Notice of Settlement12 that the case settled, hereby orders this action dismissed without prejudice. The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case vacated and taken off calendar. The Court retains jurisdiction for sixty (60) days to vacate this order and to reopen the action upon showing of good cause that the settlement has not been completed. Any outstanding Orders to Show Cause are discharged. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Settlement
Fri 06/09 8:29 AM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Nicko Casuga. (Charity, Garrett) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 06/02 4:00 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff's, to show cause in writing no later than 6/9/2023, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See document for further information). (jp) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 04/03 8:03 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Nicko Casuga. upon Experian Information Solutions, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/31/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. (Charity, Garrett) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 03/17 10:48 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 9:38 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Wed 03/15 9:29 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 9:29 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 9:29 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/13 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties (Charity, Garrett) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/13 3:20 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Nicko Casuga. (Charity, Garrett) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/13 3:19 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Nicko Casuga. (Charity, Garrett) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 3:18 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34945898 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Garrett Forrester Charity added to party Nicko Casuga(pty:pla))(Charity, Garrett) |