California Central District Court
Judge:John W Holcomb
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 8:23-cv-00455
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2023
Terminated:Mar 06, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 2:20 AM PDT
Defendant
Jennifer B Higgins
Represented By
Evan R. Franke
Ausa - Us Attorneys Office
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Defendant
Ted H Kim
Represented By
Evan R. Franke
Ausa - Us Attorneys Office
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Evan R. Franke
Ausa - Us Attorneys Office
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Plaintiff
Melika Amini
Represented By
Shawn Sedaghat
Shawn S Sedaghat Alc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
11 11 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Wed 03/06 3:04 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Melika Amini. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Sedaghat, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
10 10 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 05/18 11:04 AM
ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb, Granting Joint Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Adjudication of Application9 . The instant action is STAYED until April 8, 2024. ( Status Conference is SET for 4/5/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb.) The parties are DIRECTED to file no later than March 22, 2024, a Joint Report that advised the Court regarding the status of this matter. ( Status Report due by 3/22/2024.) SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
9 9 stip Stay Case Wed 05/17 2:50 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Adjudication of Application filed by Defendants Jennifer B Higgins, Ted H Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas.(Attorney Evan Richard Franke added to party Jennifer B Higgins(pty:dft), Attorney Evan Richard Franke added to party Ted H Kim(pty:dft), Attorney Evan Richard Franke added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft))(Franke, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 03/15 9:53 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 03/14 5:40 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Jennifer B Higgins, Ted H Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas, Office of the U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 03/14 5:38 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 03/14 5:38 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
4 4 notice Summons Request Mon 03/13 3:37 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff Melika Amini. (Sedaghat, Shawn)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 03/13 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Melika Amini, (Sedaghat, Shawn)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 03/13 3:34 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Melika Amini. (Sedaghat, Shawn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/13 3:33 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34946214 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Melika Amini. (Attorney Shawn Sedaghat added to party Melika Amini(pty:pla))(Sedaghat, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit #1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit #2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit #3