James Doe v. USCIS et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | David O Carter |
Referred: | John D Early |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00456 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 03, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 2:21 AM PDT |
Defendant
Los Angeles Asylum Office
PO BOX 65015
Anaheim, CA 92815 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
USCIS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David M. Radel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Doe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 59 minutes ago |
Friday, January 19, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 01/19 10:59 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff James Doe. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Cuzzolina, James) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Wed 05/03 3:07 PM
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Joint Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Adjudication of Application9 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the instant action shall be stayed until February 3, 2024. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
stip
Stay Case
Mon 05/01 12:00 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Adjudication of Plaintiff's I-589 Application for Asylum and for Withholding of Removal filed by defendants Los Angeles Asylum Office, David M. Radel, USCIS.(Attorney Chung Hae Han added to party Los Angeles Asylum Office(pty:dft), Attorney Chung Hae Han added to party David M. Radel(pty:dft), Attorney Chung Hae Han added to party USCIS(pty:dft))(Han, Chung) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/21 10:58 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/15 4:32 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant USCIS. (twdb) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/15 12:30 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff`s Attorney James Doe. (Cuzzolina, James) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 12:28 PM
Plaintiff`s NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff`s Attorney James Doe, (Cuzzolina, James) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Tue 03/14 5:51 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet should be e-filed separately. The correct event category is located under Civil Events - Other Filings - Miscellaneous Filings. (car) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/14 5:51 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 5:51 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 3:40 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34946341 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff`s Attorney James Doe. (Attorney James D Cuzzolina added to party James Doe(pty:pla))(Cuzzolina, James) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |