Yang Wang v. Alejandro Mayorkas
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | R Gary Klausner |
Referred: | Karen L Stevenson |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01871 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 22, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 3:16 AM PDT |
Defendant
Alejandro J. Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yang Wang
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, February 22, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Thu 02/22 10:14 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Yang Wang. Dismissal is WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Pickering, Lisa) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Mon 06/19 5:40 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Oil Oil counsel for Defendant Alejandro J. Mayorkas. Adding Ernesto Horacio Molina, Jr. as counsel of record for Alejandro Mayorkas for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Alejandro Mayorkas. (Attorney Oil Oil added to party Alejandro J. Mayorkas(pty:dft))(Oil, Oil) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Mon 05/22 3:29 PM
ORDER Re Joint Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Adjudication of Application11 by Judge R. Gary Klausner that the instant action shall be stayed until 3/8/2024. The Court hereby ORDERS this matter removed from the Courts active caseload, pending the outcome of said proceedings and/or further order of this Court. Counsel are to properly motion this Court to place this action back on active status upon the termination of the stay. All pending dates and hearings are vacated and taken off-calendar. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
11 | 11
stip
Stay Case
Mon 05/22 8:56 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending adjudication of plaintiff's 589 application filed by defendant Alejandro J. Mayorkas.(Buchanan, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Appearance
Fri 05/19 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher B. Buchanan on behalf of Defendant Alejandro J. Mayorkas (Attorney Christopher B. Buchanan added to party Alejandro J. Mayorkas(pty:dft))(Buchanan, Christopher) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 2:26 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 2:25 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Alejandro J. Mayorkas. (jtil) |
|
7 | 7
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 03/15 1:36 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Wed 03/15 1:31 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 1:30 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/13 6:00 PM
PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff YANG WANG, (Pickering, Lisa) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/13 5:59 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff YANG WANG. (Pickering, Lisa) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/13 5:58 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by PLAINTIFF YANG WANG. (Pickering, Lisa) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 5:56 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34948093 - Fee: $402, filed by PLAINTIFF YANG WANG. (Attorney Lisa D Pickering added to party YANG WANG(pty:pla))(Pickering, Lisa) |