California Central District Court
Judge:R Gary Klausner
Referred: Karen L Stevenson
Case #: 2:23-cv-01871
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2023
Terminated:May 22, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 3:16 AM PDT
Defendant
Alejandro J. Mayorkas
Represented By
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Ernesto Molina
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Christopher B. Buchanan
Doj-Civil
contact info
Plaintiff
Yang Wang
Represented By
Lisa Pickering
Law Offices Of Lisa Pickering
contact info
Lisa D Pickering
Law Offices Of Lisa Pickering
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, February 22, 2024
14 14 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Thu 02/22 10:14 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Yang Wang. Dismissal is WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Pickering, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 19, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 06/19 5:40 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Oil Oil counsel for Defendant Alejandro J. Mayorkas. Adding Ernesto Horacio Molina, Jr. as counsel of record for Alejandro Mayorkas for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Alejandro Mayorkas. (Attorney Oil Oil added to party Alejandro J. Mayorkas(pty:dft))(Oil, Oil)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 05/22 3:29 PM
ORDER Re Joint Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Adjudication of Application11 by Judge R. Gary Klausner that the instant action shall be stayed until 3/8/2024. The Court hereby ORDERS this matter removed from the Courts active caseload, pending the outcome of said proceedings and/or further order of this Court. Counsel are to properly motion this Court to place this action back on active status upon the termination of the stay. All pending dates and hearings are vacated and taken off-calendar. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
11 11 stip Stay Case Mon 05/22 8:56 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending adjudication of plaintiff's 589 application filed by defendant Alejandro J. Mayorkas.(Buchanan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, May 19, 2023
10 10 notice Appearance Fri 05/19 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher B. Buchanan on behalf of Defendant Alejandro J. Mayorkas (Attorney Christopher B. Buchanan added to party Alejandro J. Mayorkas(pty:dft))(Buchanan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
9 9 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 03/15 2:26 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 03/15 2:25 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Alejandro J. Mayorkas. (jtil)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 03/15 1:36 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 03/15 1:31 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 03/15 1:30 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 03/13 6:00 PM
PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff YANG WANG, (Pickering, Lisa)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 03/13 5:59 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff YANG WANG. (Pickering, Lisa)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Mon 03/13 5:58 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by PLAINTIFF YANG WANG. (Pickering, Lisa)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/13 5:56 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34948093 - Fee: $402, filed by PLAINTIFF YANG WANG. (Attorney Lisa D Pickering added to party YANG WANG(pty:pla))(Pickering, Lisa)
Related: [-]