California Central District Court
Judge:Jesus G Bernal
Referred: Kenly Kiya Kato
Case #: 5:23-cv-00412
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2023
Terminated:May 24, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 1:50 AM PDT
Defendant
David M. Radel
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Gwen M Gamble
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Xue Mu
A 209 919 296 14111 Sacramento Street
Fontana, CA 92336


Docket last updated: 27 minutes ago
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
10 10 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)) Wed 11/15 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Xue Mu. (es)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
9 9 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 05/24 10:43 AM
ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Joint Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Adjudication of Application8 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the instant action shall be stayed until March 5, 2024. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
8 8 stip Stay Case Tue 05/09 11:11 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending ADJUDICATION OF APPLICATION filed by Defendant David M. Radel.(Attorney Gwen M Gamble added to party David M. Radel(pty:dft))(Gamble, Gwen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 POS
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
7 7 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Wed 04/05 12:35 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Xue Mu, upon Defendant David M. Radel served on 3/22/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. Service by mail and acknowledgment of receipt of service on 3/22/23 with return receipt requested CCP, 415.40. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (twdb)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Wed 04/05 12:27 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE ON AN AGENCY OR CORPORATION OF THE UNITED STATES Executed by Plaintiff Xue Mu, upon Defendant David M. Radel served on 3/27/2023, answer due 5/26/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy cert mail receipt sent to civil process clerk, signed by R. Childress. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to no signature. Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 03/13 10:11 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 03/13 10:10 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/13 10:09 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery)1 as to Defendant David M. Radel. (jtil)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 03/13 10:07 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Xue Mu. (jtil)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 03/13 9:49 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Xue Mu against Defendant David M. Radel. Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (Filing fee $ 402 Paid.) #1 CV71) (jtil)
Related: [-]