Jingyang Li v. Alejandro Mayorkas et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jesus G Bernal |
Referred: | Shashi H Kewalramani |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00428 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 28, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 2:23 AM PDT |
Defendant
Merrick Garland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Terri Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jingyang Li
A 201 982 360 14183 Remington Court
Fontana, CA 92336 |
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, June 28, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Dismiss Case
Thu 06/29 10:23 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Order (1) GRANTING Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. 9); (2) DISMISSING the Complaint; and (3) VACATING the July 3, 2023 Hearing9 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (twdb) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss Case
Tue 05/30 2:51 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Jennifer R. Jacobs filed by Defendant Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Terri Robinson. Motion set for hearing on 7/3/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attorney Jennifer R. Jacobs added to party Merrick Garland(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer R. Jacobs added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer R. Jacobs added to party Terri Robinson(pty:dft)) (Jacobs, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Jennifer R. Jacobs, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Proof of Service | ||
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/13 6:52 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/13 6:52 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (car) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/13 6:50 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to Defendant United States Attorney's Office (car) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/13 6:48 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to Defendant Alejandro Mayorkas. (car) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/13 6:47 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to Defendant Merrick Garland. (car) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/13 6:46 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to Defendant Terri Robinson. (car) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/13 6:45 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jingyang Li, (car) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 03/13 6:34 PM
COMPLAINT against Defendants Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Terri Robinson. Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. kewalramani.(Filing fee $ 402 FEE PAID), filed by Plaintiff Jingyang Li. (car) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |