Securities and Exchange Commission v. John David Gessin et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | James V Selna |
Referred: | Autumn D Spaeth |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00460 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 1:48 AM PDT |
Defendant
Equifunds, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John David Gessin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ice Fleet LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Securities and Exchange Commission
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
stip
Protective Order
Tue 03/19 10:45 AM
Amended STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission.(Zamarin, Michelle) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
stip
Protective Order
Thu 03/14 12:11 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission.(Zamarin, Michelle) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, October 06, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form
Fri 10/06 8:44 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) John Libby has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
adr
Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)
Thu 10/05 7:03 AM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that John Libby may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission(Zamarin, Michelle) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Wed 07/26 1:30 PM
ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL SETTING DATES; PREPARATION FOR TRIAL; AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL before Judge James V. Selna. (See Document for Details and Deadlines) (eva) |
|
23 | 23
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 07/26 12:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER RE SCHEDULING DATES by Judge James V. Selna: The Court has read and considered the parties Rule 26(f) Report and sets the following dates: Jury Trial April 08, 2025 at 8:30 a.m. Final PreTrial Conference February 24, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. Discovery Cut-off November 11, 2024. Expert Discovery Cut-off October 11, 2024. Law and Motion Cut-off January 13, 2025 at 1:30 p.m. The Court orders that any settlement discussions shall be completed not later than December 13, 2024. The Scheduling Conference set for July 31, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. is VACATED. re: Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan22 . [SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND DEADLINES.] (es) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Mon 07/17 10:56 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 8 days, filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission.. (Zamarin, Michelle) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 06/05 8:57 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying Jack Saryan aka Jack Nicholas; Gianni Saryan aka Gianni Nicholas; John David Gessin. (Boris, Donna) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Thu 06/01 10:34 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Wed 05/31 3:47 PM
Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 7/31/2023 at 10:30 a.m. before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 7/21/2023. (eva) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 05/30 5:39 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by defendant Equifunds, Inc., John David Gessin, Ice Fleet LLC.(Boris, Donna) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Tue 05/02 12:27 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),,14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect case number. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Mon 05/01 11:19 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing: 8:23-cv-00460-JVS-ADS. No action required at this time. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Fri 04/28 10:49 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, filed by defendant Equifunds, Inc., John David Gessin, Ice Fleet LLC.(Boris, Donna) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Fri 04/28 10:37 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Donna M Boris counsel for Defendants Equifunds, Inc., John David Gessin, Ice Fleet LLC. Adding Donna M. Boris as counsel of record for John David Gessin; Equifunds, Inc.; Ice Fleet LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant John David Gessin; Equifunds, Inc.; Ice Fleet LLC. (Attorney Donna M Boris added to party Equifunds, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Donna M Boris added to party John David Gessin(pty:dft), Attorney Donna M Boris added to party Ice Fleet LLC(pty:dft))(Boris, Donna) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 04/07 10:13 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Defendant Equifunds, Inc. served on 4/7/2023, answer due 4/28/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Associate at the UPS Store Private Mailbox of John David Gessin in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Zamarin, Michelle) |
|
12 | 12
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 04/07 10:09 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Defendant Ice Fleet LLC served on 4/7/2023, answer due 4/28/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Associate at the UPS Store Private Mailbox of John David Gessin in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Zamarin, Michelle) |
|
11 | 11
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 04/07 9:55 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Defendant John David Gessin served on 4/7/2023, answer due 4/28/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Associate at the UPS Store Private Mailbox of John David Gessin in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Zamarin, Michelle) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 03/21 3:34 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE4 by Judge James V. Selna: Granting4 Non-Resident Attorney Michelle A. Zamarin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff, Security and Exchange Commission, designating Gary Y. Leung as local counsel. (es) |
|
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/21 2:56 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (eva) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 11:30 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Equifunds, Inc., John David Gessin, Ice Fleet LLC. (lh) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Wed 03/15 11:28 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 11:28 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 11:27 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 03/14 9:45 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michelle A. Zamarin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Leung, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/14 9:39 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Leung, Gary) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/14 9:36 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Leung, Gary) |
|
1 | 1
15
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 9:31 AM
COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attorney Gary Y. Leung added to party Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla))(Leung, Gary) |