Elam v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Barry A Bryant |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02035 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI) |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 05, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, October 05, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Relief
Fri 10/27 1:36 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY FILED FOR ECF PURPOSES ONLY (src) |
|
16 | 16
![]() JUDGMENT AFFIRMING THE DECISION OF THE COMMISSIONER and Plaintiffs case is dismissed with prejudice as set forth in the15 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on October 5, 2023. (tmc) |
|
15 | 15
![]() MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on October 5, 2023. (tmc) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Leifert, Jeff) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff Leifert on behalf of Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Leifert, Jeff) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Amanda D Elam. (Caddell, Fred) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Thu 06/15 8:39 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on June 15, 2023. (mfj) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Amanda D Elam. (Caddell, Fred) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Social Security Scheduling Order
Wed 05/17 7:56 AM
TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 6/16/2023. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on May 17, 2023. (mfj) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Taylor, Candace) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
utility
Memo of Reassignment
Mon 04/24 12:33 PM
TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable Barry A Bryant. Honorable Mark E. Ford no longer assigned to the case. (hnc) |
||
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
service
Affidavit of Service as to USA
Wed 03/15 8:57 AM
Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 3/14/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (bjb) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/14 12:10 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit and DIRECTING SERVICE on the Social Security Administration Commissioner and the US Attorney for the Western District/Arkansas via notice of electronic filing without prepayment of fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to note the date of service on the docket sheet. Further, the Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on March 14, 2023. (cla) |
|
5 | 5
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Amanda D Elam. (Caddell, Fred) |
|
4 | 4
![]() CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Amanda D Elam. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Caddell, Fred) |
|
3 | 3
![]() COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Amanda D Elam.(Caddell, Fred) |
|
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 3/28/2023.(tmc) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET by Amanda D Elam. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed. A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (tmc) |