Andrew Klein v. Gamma Entertainment, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Mark C Scarsi |
Referred: | Alexander F Mackinnon |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01890 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 3:08 AM PDT |
Defendant
Gamma Entertainment, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Klein
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 25, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Tue 04/25 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Andrew Klein. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Turin, Yevgeniy) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 04/06 7:45 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Andrew Klein, upon Defendant Gamma Entertainment, Inc. served on 4/5/2023, answer due 4/26/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons returned. (Turin, Yevgeniy) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 03/15 10:01 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Wed 03/15 9:50 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 9:45 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Gamma Entertainment, Inc. (lh) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Wed 03/15 9:40 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 9:39 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 9:39 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 12:51 PM
(Corrected) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Andrew Klein, (Turin, Yevgeniy) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 12:49 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Andrew Klein, (Turin, Yevgeniy) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/14 12:47 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Andrew Klein. (Turin, Yevgeniy) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 12:46 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34952711 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Andrew Klein. (Attorney Yevgeniy Y. Turin added to party Andrew Klein(pty:pla))(Turin, Yevgeniy) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |