California Central District Court
Judge:John W Holcomb
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:23-cv-00462
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2023
Terminated:Aug 09, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 3:11 AM PDT
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By
Thomas P Quinn, Jr
Nokes And Quinn Apc
contact info
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Defendant
Transportation Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff
Marcus Scott
Represented By
Garrett Forrester Charity
Mccarthy Law PLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Transunion, LLC
Terminated: 06/29/2023


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
27 27 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) Wed 08/09 2:01 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL Marcus Scott pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Charity, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
26 26 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) Thu 08/03 8:06 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL Marcus Scott pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Transportation Federal Credit Union. (Charity, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
25 25 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Thu 07/13 10:24 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: In light of the Notice of Settlement filed July 13, 2023 [ECF No. 24], indicating that the case has settled, this action is placed in inactive status. By September 13, 2023, the parties shall file either (1) a Stipulation of Dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i); (2) a Stipulation for an Order of Dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2); or (3) a motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to comply with this Order in a timely manner, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of September 14, 2023. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party. All previously set deadlines and dates are hereby VACATED. (JS-6) THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Settlement Thu 07/13 10:16 AM
NOTICE of Settlement Marcus Scott. (Charity, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
23 23 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) Thu 06/29 8:06 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL Marcus Scott pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Transunion, LLC. (Charity, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
22 22 2 pgs order Order Thu 06/22 1:58 PM
ORDER ON MOTION FOR SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge John W. Holcomb19 The joint motion for a second extension of time for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC to respond to the complaint is GRANTED. Equifax Information Services, LLC shall respond to the complaint on or before July 20, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) Wed 06/21 12:57 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL Marcus Scott pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Charity, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 19, 2023
20 20 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 06/19 3:24 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marcus Scott, upon Defendant Transportation Federal Credit Union served on 6/12/2023, answer due 7/3/2023. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Charity, Garrett)
Related: [-]
19 19 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Mon 06/19 11:56 AM
Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 07/20/2023 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend time for Equifax to Answer
Friday, June 16, 2023
18 18 order Extension of Time to File Fri 06/16 9:59 AM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANT TRANSPORTION FEDERAL CREDIT UNION17 by Judge John W. Holcomb. The Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall have an additional ninety days to serve Defendant Transportation Federal Credit Union. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 06/13 4:01 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Serve Defendant Transportation Federal Credit Union Marcus Scott. (Charity, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
16 16 notice Settlement Tue 06/06 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Marcus Scott. (Charity, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
15 15 notice Settlement Thu 05/25 8:22 AM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant TransUnion, LLC Marcus Scott. (Charity, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
14 14 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 05/18 9:06 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC, identifying Equifax Inc.. (Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
13 13 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Thu 05/18 9:04 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Equifax Information Services, LLC answer now due 6/20/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Attorney Thomas P Quinn, Jr added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 04/04 11:49 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Marcus Scott. upon Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/21/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (Charity, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 04/03 8:05 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Marcus Scott. upon Experian Information Solutions, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/21/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (Charity, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 03/23 7:51 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Marcus Scott. upon Transunion, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/21/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (Charity, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/16 12:24 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Transportation Federal Credit Union and Transunion, LLC. (jtil)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 03/16 10:25 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 03/15 5:47 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 03/15 5:46 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 03/15 5:46 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 03/14 1:22 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties (Charity, Garrett)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Tue 03/14 1:19 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Marcus Scott.(Charity, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 03/14 1:16 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Marcus Scott. (Charity, Garrett)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 03/14 1:14 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34953064 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Garrett Forrester Charity added to party Marcus Scott(pty:pla))(Charity, Garrett)
Related: [-]