Marcus Scott v. Transportation Federal Credit Union et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John W Holcomb |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00462 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 3:11 AM PDT |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Transportation Federal Credit Union
|
|
Plaintiff
Marcus Scott
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Transunion, LLC
Terminated: 06/29/2023
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 09, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
![]() NOTICE OF DISMISSAL Marcus Scott pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Charity, Garrett) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
![]() NOTICE OF DISMISSAL Marcus Scott pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Transportation Federal Credit Union. (Charity, Garrett) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Thu 07/13 10:24 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: In light of the Notice of Settlement filed July 13, 2023 [ECF No. 24], indicating that the case has settled, this action is placed in inactive status. By September 13, 2023, the parties shall file either (1) a Stipulation of Dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i); (2) a Stipulation for an Order of Dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2); or (3) a motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to comply with this Order in a timely manner, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of September 14, 2023. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party. All previously set deadlines and dates are hereby VACATED. (JS-6) THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla) |
|
24 | 24
![]() NOTICE of Settlement Marcus Scott. (Charity, Garrett) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
![]() NOTICE OF DISMISSAL Marcus Scott pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Transunion, LLC. (Charity, Garrett) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
![]() ORDER ON MOTION FOR SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge John W. Holcomb19 The joint motion for a second extension of time for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC to respond to the complaint is GRANTED. Equifax Information Services, LLC shall respond to the complaint on or before July 20, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl) |
|
21 | 21
![]() NOTICE OF DISMISSAL Marcus Scott pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Charity, Garrett) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marcus Scott, upon Defendant Transportation Federal Credit Union served on 6/12/2023, answer due 7/3/2023. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Charity, Garrett) |
|
19 | 19
![]() Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 07/20/2023 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Quinn, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANT TRANSPORTION FEDERAL CREDIT UNION17 by Judge John W. Holcomb. The Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall have an additional ninety days to serve Defendant Transportation Federal Credit Union. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Serve Defendant Transportation Federal Credit Union Marcus Scott. (Charity, Garrett) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, June 06, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Marcus Scott. (Charity, Garrett) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant TransUnion, LLC Marcus Scott. (Charity, Garrett) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC, identifying Equifax Inc.. (Quinn, Thomas) |
|
13 | 13
![]() STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Equifax Information Services, LLC answer now due 6/20/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Attorney Thomas P Quinn, Jr added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Quinn, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Marcus Scott. upon Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/21/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (Charity, Garrett) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Marcus Scott. upon Experian Information Solutions, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/21/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (Charity, Garrett) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Marcus Scott. upon Transunion, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/21/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (Charity, Garrett) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Transportation Federal Credit Union and Transunion, LLC. (jtil) |
|
8 | 8
![]() STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties (Charity, Garrett) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Marcus Scott.(Charity, Garrett) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Marcus Scott. (Charity, Garrett) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34953064 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Garrett Forrester Charity added to party Marcus Scott(pty:pla))(Charity, Garrett) |