New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jennifer H Rearden
Case #: 1:23-cv-02173
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 5:36 AM EDT
Defendant
Timour Triplett
2412 South 5th Street
Philadelphia, PA 19148
Represented By
John Robert Skrabanek
Thompson & Skrabanek, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Triplett Contracting LLC
2412 South 5th Street
Philadelphia, PA 19148
Represented By
John Robert Skrabanek
Thompson & Skrabanek, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
FMG Express Facility Management Group LLC
Represented By
Barry L. Cohen
Royer Cooper Cohen Braunfeld LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, June 05, 2023
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 06/05 11:46 PM
ANSWER to3 Complaint,,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Timour Triplett, Triplett Contracting LLC..(Skrabanek, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/24 1:09 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Robert Skrabanek on behalf of Timour Triplett, Triplett Contracting LLC..(Skrabanek, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
15 15 misc Clerk's Certificate of Default Thu 05/04 9:17 AM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Triplett Contracting LLC and Timour Triplett.(km)
Related: [-]
14 14 respoth Declaration in Support (non-motion) Thu 05/04 8:54 AM
DECLARATION of Barry L. Cohen, Esquire in Support re:13 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,. Document filed by FMG Express Facility Management Group LLC..(Cohen, Barry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Request to Enter Default,
Att: 2 Supplement Certificate of Service
13 13 misc Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default Thu 05/04 8:52 AM
PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by FMG Express Facility Management Group LLC..(Cohen, Barry) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 5/4/2023 (km)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
misc Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error Wed 05/03 3:21 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Barry Cohen to RE-FILE Document 12 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Triplett Contracting LLC; Timour Triplett . The documents are not filed correctly. Please refer to ECF Rule 16.1. The clerk's certificate is not as to form. Each defendant's name needs to be listed on the certificate, along with the name of the person who accepted service of the summons and complaint. Please refer to our website, under forms for a sample clerk's certificate. refile the clerk's certificate under Proposed Orders, proposed clerk's certificate of default. The declaration is filed under Other Answers, Declaration in support of a non-motion. The request to enter default, along with any other documents you want to submit, can be filed as attachments to the declaration. (km)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
12 12 motion Entry of Default Tue 05/02 9:01 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Triplett Contracting LLC; Timour Triplett . Document filed by FMG Express Facility Management Group LLC..(Cohen, Barry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Barry L. Cohen, Esquire in Support of Request to Enter Default,
Att: 3 Affidavit Certificate of Service
Thursday, March 23, 2023
11 11 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 03/23 12:35 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Timour Triplett served on 3/23/2023, answer due 4/13/2023. Service was accepted by Timour Triplett. Document filed by FMG Express Facility Management Group LLC..(Cohen, Barry)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 03/23 12:33 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Triplett Contracting LLC served on 3/23/2023, answer due 4/13/2023. Service was accepted by Timour Triplett. Document filed by FMG Express Facility Management Group LLC..(Cohen, Barry)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
9 9 service Summons Issued Fri 03/17 3:12 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Triplett Contracting LLC..(jgo)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Fri 03/17 3:12 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Timour Triplett..(jgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 03/15 2:06 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Timour Triplett, re:3 Complaint,,,. Document filed by FMG Express Facility Management Group LLC..(Cohen, Barry)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 03/15 2:00 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Triplett Contracting LLC, re:3 Complaint,,,. Document filed by FMG Express Facility Management Group LLC..(Cohen, Barry)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 03/15 1:53 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cohen, Barry)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 03/15 11:32 AM
FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST FILING ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Triplett Contracting LLC and Timour Triplett, re:3 Complaint,,,. Document filed by FMG EXPRESS FACILITY MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC..(Cohen, Barry) Modified on 3/15/2023 (jgo)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint Wed 03/15 11:27 AM
COMPLAINT against Timour Triplett, Triplett Contracting LLC. Document filed by FMG EXPRESS FACILITY MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC..(Cohen, Barry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1_07.05.2022_Email re Facility Management Supplier,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2_09.7.2022 Email,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - The Award Letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Services Agreement,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Services Agreement,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - The Letter,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - 12.17.2022 Notice of Contract Deficiency and Required Action,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - 12.16.2022 Email Thread,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - 12.22.2022 Email Thread,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - 12.27.2022 Email re: No Services All Year,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - 12.24.2022 Notice of Contract Termination,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - 2.23.2022 Assignment,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - Notice of Assignment,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 - 2.12.2023 Email re: Demand for Payment,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15 - 12.29.2022 Email re: Owed Funds
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Wed 03/15 12:43 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Barry L. Cohen to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the incorrest Citizenship Plaintiff code was selected under Citizenship of Principal Parties;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Wed 03/15 12:44 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Barry L. Cohen. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 2 (Citizen of Another State);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State);. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Wed 03/15 12:45 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Barry L. Cohen. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: FMG EXPRESS FACILITY MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 03/15 12:46 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 03/15 12:47 PM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 03/15 12:47 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 03/15 12:50 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Barry L. Cohen to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; each summons request must be filed separately OR one summons request may be filed listing all of the parties on the PDF 'To' section or attaching a 'rider';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 03/14 4:21 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cohen, Barry)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/14 4:20 PM
COMPLAINT against Timour Triplett, Triplett Contracting LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27467471)Document filed by FMG EXPRESS FACILITY MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC..(Cohen, Barry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1_07.05.2022_Email re Facility Management Supplier,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2_09.7.2022 Email,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - The Award Letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Services Agreement,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Services Agreement,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - The Letter,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - 12.17.2022 Notice of Contract Deficiency and Required Action,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - 12.16.2022 Email Thread,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - 12.22.2022 Email Thread,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - 12.27.2022 Email re: No Services All Year,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - 12.24.2022 Notice of Contract Termination,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - 2.23.2022 Assignment,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - Notice of Assignment,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 - 2.12.2023 Email re: Demand for Payment,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15 - 12.29.2022 Email re: Owed Funds