California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: Margo A Rocconi
Case #: 2:23-cv-01896
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2023
Terminated:Apr 03, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 1:51 AM PDT
Defendant
Toasted and Roasted LLC
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Kevin Cox
Represented By
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 03, 2023
11 11 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Mon 04/03 9:24 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Kevin Cox. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
10 10 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 03/17 10:04 AM
MINUTES OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND ORDER FOR JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause within 14 days of this order. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims and the dismissal of any such claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 03/16 4:25 PM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 03/15 3:36 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Toasted and Roasted LLC. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 03/15 3:28 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 03/15 3:27 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 03/15 3:27 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (car)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
4 4 notice Summons Request Tue 03/14 2:37 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Kevin Cox. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 03/14 2:36 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 03/14 2:36 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kevin Cox. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 03/14 2:35 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34954270 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Kevin Cox(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]