California Central District Court
Judge:Josephine L Staton
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 2:23-cv-01903
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2023
Terminated:May 18, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 3:21 AM PDT
Defendant
Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By
Robert Cruzen
Klarquist Sparkman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Beverly Ornstein
Represented By
Stephen M. Doniger
Doniger Burroughs
contact info
Kelsey Marie Schultz
Doniger Burroughs
contact info
Plaintiff
Howard Schatz
Represented By
Stephen M. Doniger
Doniger Burroughs
contact info
Kelsey Marie Schultz
Doniger Burroughs
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, June 12, 2023
15 15 stip Dismiss Case Mon 06/12 6:07 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to 41(a)((1)(A)(ii); With Prejudice filed by Plaintiffs Beverly Ornstein, Howard Schatz.(Doniger, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
14 14 order Staying Case ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/18 2:44 PM
ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINAL SETTLEMENT, REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE CASELOAD, AND FILING OF DISMISSAL by Judge Josephine L. Staton. On 5/18/2023, Plaintiff filed a Notice of Settlement (Doc.13 ), indicating that the case has fully settled. Based thereon, the Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed and that this action is removed from the Courts active caseload. The parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal no later than 7/17/2023. Until the Dismissal Date, the Court retains full jurisdiction over this action. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated). (jp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
13 13 notice Settlement Wed 05/17 5:27 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiffs Beverly Ornstein, Howard Schatz. (Doniger, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
12 12 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 04/11 4:47 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Amazon.com, Inc. answer now due 5/22/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc..(Attorney Robert Cruzen added to party Amazon.com, Inc.(pty:dft))(Cruzen, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 03/31 10:25 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Howard Schatz, Beverly Ornstein, upon Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. served on 3/31/2023, answer due 4/21/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company c/o Lynanne Gares/Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 19, 2023
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Sun 03/19 9:12 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (vv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 03/15 3:00 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. (ghap)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 03/15 2:49 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 03/15 2:49 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 03/15 2:48 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
5 5 notice Summons Request Tue 03/14 4:24 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs Beverly Ornstein, Howard Schatz. (Doniger, Stephen)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Tue 03/14 4:23 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Beverly Ornstein, Howard Schatz. (Doniger, Stephen)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 03/14 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Beverly Ornstein, Howard Schatz, (Doniger, Stephen)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 03/14 4:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Beverly Ornstein, Howard Schatz. (Doniger, Stephen)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 03/14 4:07 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34955697 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Howard Schatz, Beverly Ornstein. (Attorney Stephen M. Doniger added to party Beverly Ornstein(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen M. Doniger added to party Howard Schatz(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen)
Related: [-]