Howard Schatz et al v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Josephine L Staton |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01903 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 18, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 3:21 AM PDT |
Defendant
Amazon.com, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Beverly Ornstein
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Howard Schatz
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to 41(a)((1)(A)(ii); With Prejudice filed by Plaintiffs Beverly Ornstein, Howard Schatz.(Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINAL SETTLEMENT, REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE CASELOAD, AND FILING OF DISMISSAL by Judge Josephine L. Staton. On 5/18/2023, Plaintiff filed a Notice of Settlement (Doc.13 ), indicating that the case has fully settled. Based thereon, the Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed and that this action is removed from the Courts active caseload. The parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal no later than 7/17/2023. Until the Dismissal Date, the Court retains full jurisdiction over this action. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated). (jp) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiffs Beverly Ornstein, Howard Schatz. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Amazon.com, Inc. answer now due 5/22/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc..(Attorney Robert Cruzen added to party Amazon.com, Inc.(pty:dft))(Cruzen, Robert) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Howard Schatz, Beverly Ornstein, upon Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. served on 3/31/2023, answer due 4/21/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company c/o Lynanne Gares/Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Sunday, March 19, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (vv) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. (ghap) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs Beverly Ornstein, Howard Schatz. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
4 | 4
![]() REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Beverly Ornstein, Howard Schatz. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Beverly Ornstein, Howard Schatz, (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Beverly Ornstein, Howard Schatz. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34955697 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Howard Schatz, Beverly Ornstein. (Attorney Stephen M. Doniger added to party Beverly Ornstein(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen M. Doniger added to party Howard Schatz(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) |